E. et al v. Publicis et al
Plaintiff: Volker E., Sharon E. and T. E.
Defendant: Publicis and Publicis Benefits Connection Medical and Prescription Drug Plan
Case Number: 2:2022cv00721
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants. Plaintiffs have up to and until February 15, 2023, to serve the named Defendants. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 1/5/2023. (mh)
January 4, 2023 Filing 4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants filed by Plaintiffs Sharon E., T. E., Volker E.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nielson, Laura)
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah is available to conduct proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. The magistrate judge may preside over this case only after the relevant parties voluntarily sign and return the Consent Form. To have a magistrate judge preside over this case, please complete and return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case docket. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Sharon E., T. E., Volker E.. (Notice generated by Court) Form due by 12/6/2022. (ks)
November 15, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Publicis, Publicis Benefits Connection Medical and Prescription Drug Plan (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4506745) filed by Volker E., Sharon E., T. E.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Nielson, Laura)
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Plaintiffs Sharon E., T. E., Volker E. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402. by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E. et al v. Publicis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Volker E.
Represented By: Laura C. Nielson
Represented By: G. Eric Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon E.
Represented By: G. Eric Nielson
Represented By: Laura C. Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. E.
Represented By: G. Eric Nielson
Represented By: Laura C. Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publicis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publicis Benefits Connection Medical and Prescription Drug Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?