Standard Insurances et al v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Plaintiff: Standard Insurances, Standard Plumbing Supply, Plastic Services and Products, The Reese Family 101 Trust, Polymer Compunding, Standard Logistic Services, Reese Real Estate & Investment, Richard N Reese Family Limited Liability, UD Design, Aire-flo Heating & Air conditioning, KSR Legacy Investment, DA DI Bathware, Clifco Sheet Metal Manufacturing, Reesesource Leasing, Richard N. Reese and Jill P Reese
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service, Department of the Treasury and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2023cv00047
Filed: January 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UD Design, Standard Logistic Services, Reesesource Leasing, Polymer Compunding, Standard Insurances, The Reese Family 101 Trust, Richard N Reese Family Limited Liability, Reese Real Estate & Investment, Richard N. Reese, Jill P Reese, Plastic Services and Products, KSR Legacy Investment, Clifco Sheet Metal Manufacturing, DA DI Bathware, Aire-flo Heating & Air conditioning, Standard Plumbing Supply. United States of America served on 2/27/2023, answer due 4/28/2023. (Rupp, Joshua)
March 8, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UD Design, Standard Logistic Services, Reesesource Leasing, Polymer Compunding, Standard Insurances, The Reese Family 101 Trust, Richard N Reese Family Limited Liability, Reese Real Estate & Investment, Richard N. Reese, Jill P Reese, Plastic Services and Products, KSR Legacy Investment, Clifco Sheet Metal Manufacturing, DA DI Bathware, Aire-flo Heating & Air conditioning, Standard Plumbing Supply. Department of the Treasury served on 2/27/2023, answer due 4/28/2023. (Rupp, Joshua)
March 3, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UD Design, Standard Logistic Services, Reesesource Leasing, Polymer Compunding, Standard Insurances, The Reese Family 101 Trust, Richard N Reese Family Limited Liability, Reese Real Estate & Investment, Richard N. Reese, Jill P Reese, Plastic Services and Products, KSR Legacy Investment, Clifco Sheet Metal Manufacturing, DA DI Bathware, Aire-flo Heating & Air conditioning, Standard Plumbing Supply. United States of America served on 2/24/2023, answer due 4/25/2023. (Rupp, Joshua)
February 24, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UD Design, Standard Logistic Services, Reesesource Leasing, Polymer Compunding, Standard Insurances, The Reese Family 101 Trust, Richard N Reese Family Limited Liability, Reese Real Estate & Investment, Richard N. Reese, Jill P Reese, Plastic Services and Products, KSR Legacy Investment, Clifco Sheet Metal Manufacturing, DA DI Bathware, Aire-flo Heating & Air conditioning, Standard Plumbing Supply. Internal Revenue Service served on 2/17/2023, answer due 4/18/2023. (Rupp, Joshua)
February 17, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Swensen Haslam on behalf of Aire-flo Heating & Air conditioning, Clifco Sheet Metal Manufacturing, DA DI Bathware, KSR Legacy Investment, Plastic Services and Products, Polymer Compunding, Jill P Reese, Richard N. Reese, Reese Real Estate & Investment, Reesesource Leasing, Richard N Reese Family Limited Liability, Standard Insurances, Standard Logistic Services, Standard Plumbing Supply, The Reese Family 101 Trust, UD Design (Haslam, Carla)
February 14, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America- Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General of the United States. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
February 14, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America- Trina A. Higgins, United States Attorney's Office. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
February 14, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Internal Revenue Service - William M. Paul, Chief Counsel. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
February 14, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Department of the Treasury-Neil H. MacBride, General Counsel Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
February 7, 2023 Filing 7 RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Plaintiffs Aire-flo Heating & Air conditioning, Clifco Sheet Metal Manufacturing, DA DI Bathware, KSR Legacy Investment, Plastic Services and Products, Polymer Compunding, Jill P Reese, Richard N. Reese, Reese Real Estate & Investment, Reesesource Leasing, Richard N Reese Family Limited Liability, Standard Insurances, Standard Logistic Services, Standard Plumbing Supply, The Reese Family 101 Trust, UD Design. (alf)
February 3, 2023 Filing 6 REFUND REQUEST FOR DUPLICATE FEE PAYMENT re #2 Complaint,, filed by Rupp, Joshua.Authorized refunds for credit card or debit card payments will be processed through Pay.gov. Authorized refunds of ACH payments will be issued by check through the U.S. Treasury. A waiting period of up to 30 days may be required before your request is approved. If you have not received your refund after 40 days, please contact the clerk's office and ask to speak someone in the finance department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt AUTDC-4561606)(Rupp, Joshua)
January 30, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah is available to conduct proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. The magistrate judge may preside over this case only after the relevant parties voluntarily sign and return the Consent Form. To have a magistrate judge preside over this case, please complete and return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case docket. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Aire-flo Heating & Air conditioning, Clifco Sheet Metal Manufacturing, DA DI Bathware, KSR Legacy Investment, Plastic Services and Products, Polymer Compunding, Jill P Reese, Richard N. Reese, Reese Real Estate & Investment, Reesesource Leasing, Richard N Reese Family Limited Liability, Standard Insurances, Standard Logistic Services, Standard Plumbing Supply, The Reese Family 101 Trust, UD Design. Form due by 2/21/2023. (alf)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/23/23. (dle)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 1/20/23. (dle)
January 19, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4561618) filed by UD Design, Standard Logistic Services, Reesesource Leasing, Polymer Compunding, Standard Insurances, The Reese Family 101 Trust, Richard N Reese Family Limited Liability, Reese Real Estate & Investment, Richard N. Reese, Jill P Reese, Plastic Services and Products, KSR Legacy Investment, Clifco Sheet Metal Manufacturing, DA DI Bathware, Aire-flo Heating & Air conditioning, Standard Plumbing Supply. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rupp, Joshua)
January 19, 2023 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Plaintiffs Aire-flo Heating & Air conditioning, Clifco Sheet Metal Manufacturing, DA DI Bathware, KSR Legacy Investment, Plastic Services and Products, Polymer Compunding, Jill P Reese, Richard N. Reese, Reese Real Estate & Investment, Reesesource Leasing, Richard N Reese Family Limited Liability, Standard Insurances, Standard Logistic Services, Standard Plumbing Supply, The Reese Family 101 Trust, UD Design is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402. by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Standard Insurances et al v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standard Insurances
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: Stephen Mark Barnes
Represented By: Carla Swensen Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standard Plumbing Supply
Represented By: Stephen Mark Barnes
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: Carla Swensen Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plastic Services and Products
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: Stephen Mark Barnes
Represented By: Carla Swensen Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Reese Family 101 Trust
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: Stephen Mark Barnes
Represented By: Carla Swensen Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polymer Compunding
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: Stephen Mark Barnes
Represented By: Carla Swensen Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standard Logistic Services
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: Stephen Mark Barnes
Represented By: Carla Swensen Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reese Real Estate & Investment
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: Stephen Mark Barnes
Represented By: Carla Swensen Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard N Reese Family Limited Liability
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: Stephen Mark Barnes
Represented By: Carla Swensen Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UD Design
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Stephen Mark Barnes
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: Carla Swensen Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aire-flo Heating & Air conditioning
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: Stephen Mark Barnes
Represented By: Carla Swensen Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KSR Legacy Investment
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: Stephen Mark Barnes
Represented By: Carla Swensen Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DA DI Bathware
Represented By: Stephen Mark Barnes
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: Carla Swensen Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifco Sheet Metal Manufacturing
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: Stephen Mark Barnes
Represented By: Carla Swensen Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reesesource Leasing
Represented By: Stephen Mark Barnes
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Carla Swensen Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard N. Reese
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: Stephen Mark Barnes
Represented By: Carla Swensen Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill P Reese
Represented By: James T. Burton
Represented By: Joshua S. Rupp
Represented By: Stephen Mark Barnes
Represented By: Carla Swensen Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?