Axcess Global Sciences v. Lightning Labs et al
Plaintiff: Axcess Global Sciences
Defendant: Lightning Labs, VAAD Holdings doing business as Faber Goods, Superior Quality Products, Lanbri Shops doing business as Online Great Deals, S.O Labs and ARK Labs
Case Number: 2:2023cv00189
Filed: March 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Howard C Nielson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2023 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Axcess Global Sciences as to S.O Labs served on 4/20/2023, answer due 6/5/2023. (Platt, Brian)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #2 Complaint: Defendants are granted an extension of time up to and including June 5, 2023, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 4/24/23. (dle)
April 24, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff Axcess Global Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Platt, Brian) Modified by correcting event type on 4/24/2023 (dle).
April 7, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Axcess Global Sciences as to Lightning Labs served on 4/1/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Platt, Brian)
April 7, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Axcess Global Sciences as to VAAD Holdings served on 4/3/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Platt, Brian)
April 7, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Axcess Global Sciences as to Superior Quality Products served on 4/3/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Platt, Brian)
April 7, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Axcess Global Sciences as to Lanbri Shops served on 4/3/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Platt, Brian)
April 7, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Axcess Global Sciences as to ARK Labs served on 4/3/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Platt, Brian)
March 22, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to VAAD Holdings. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
March 22, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Issued Electronically as to Superior Quality Products. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
March 22, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to S.O Labs. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
March 22, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Lightning Labs. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
March 22, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Lanbri Shops. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
March 22, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to ARK Labs. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 3/22/23. (dle)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 3/22/23. (dle)
March 20, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Axcess Global Sciences. (Notice generated by Court) Form due by 4/10/2023. (ks)
March 20, 2023 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ks)
March 20, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4623642) filed by Axcess Global Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Platt, Brian)
March 20, 2023 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Plaintiff Axcess Global Sciences is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402. by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Axcess Global Sciences v. Lightning Labs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axcess Global Sciences
Represented By: Brian N. Platt
Represented By: Chad E. Nydegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lightning Labs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VAAD Holdings doing business as Faber Goods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Quality Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanbri Shops doing business as Online Great Deals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.O Labs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARK Labs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?