Naylor v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Trevor Michael Naylor
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2023cv00238
Filed: April 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Amend Administrative Appeal Scheduling Order. Plaintiff's Opening Brief is due 8/14/2023. The Commissioner's Responsive Brief is due 9/13/2023. Plaintiff's Reply Brief (if any) is due 9/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 6/5/2023. No attached document. (med)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Amend Administrative Appeal Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Trevor Michael Naylor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandberg, Landon)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD ANSWER. The Commissioner's answer to #5 Complaint is received filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. Under Supplemental Rule 6, Plaintiff Motion for Review of Agency Action must be filed and served by 6/14/2023. Under Supplemental Rule 7, Commissioner response brief must be filed and served on the plaintiff within 30 days after service of the Motion for Review of Agency Action. Under Supplemental Rule 8, Plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Commissioner brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Court Transcript Index, #2 Exhibit 3 - Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #3 Exhibit 4 - Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 Exhibit 5 - Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 Exhibit 6 - Non Disability Related Development, #6 Exhibit 7 - Disability Related Development, #7 Exhibit Medical Records (Volumes 1 through 6), #8 Exhibit Medical Records (Volumes 7 through 12), #9 Exhibit Medical Records (Volumes 13 through 18), #10 Exhibit Medical Records (Volumes 19 through 21), #11 Exhibit Medical Records (Volumes 22 through 25))(Berndt, Amanda)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONSENT Under DUCivR 72-4, returned Consent Forms from all relevant parties are now filed. The Magistrate Judge is presiding by consent. (alf)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Trevor Michael Naylor. (alf)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda A. Berndt on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Berndt, Amanda)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE - Service in Social Security Case, re #5 Complaint filed. Consistent with the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and DUCivR 7-4, the court has notified the Commissioner of the commencement of this action by transmitting a Notice of Electronic Filing to the Social Security Administration and United States Attorney's Office for the District of Utah. Answer due by 6/12/2023. (ks)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi (Originally received by the court on 4/11/2023). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Trevor Michael Naylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (ks)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 4/12/2023. (ks)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to Plaintiff - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Trevor Michael Naylor. Form due by 5/3/2023. (alf)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1)(ks)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A Oberg for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 4/11/2023) filed by Plaintiff Trevor Michael Naylor. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naylor v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Michael Naylor
Represented By: Landon J. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Amanda A. Berndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?