Securities and Exchange Commission v. Digital Licensing et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Digital Licensing a Wyoming corporation doing business as Debt Box, Jason R. Anderson, Jacob S Anderson, Schad E Brannon, Roydon B Nelson, James E Franklin, Western Oil Exploration, Ryan Bowen, IX Global, Joseph A Martinez, Benjamin F Daniels, Mark W Schuler, B&B Investment Group a Utah limited liability company doing business as Core 1 Crypto, Travis A Flaherty, Alton O Parker, BW Holdings a Utah limited liability company doing business as Fair Project, Brendan J Stangis, Matthew D Fritzsche, Archer Drilling, Business Funding Solutions, Blox Lending, Calmfritz Holdings, Calmes & Co, Flaherty Enterprises, IX Ventures FZCO, Purdy Oil, The Gold Collective and UIU Holdings
Receiver: Josias N. Dewey
Case Number: 2:2023cv00482
Filed: July 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0077 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 162 RESPONSE to Motion re #144 MOTION to Clarify Receivership Order , #125 Plaintiff's MOTION to Clarify Receivership Order re #10 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, (Opposition to The SEC's and Receiver's Motions to Clarify Temporary Receivership Order) filed by Defendants Jacob S Anderson, Jason R. Anderson, Blox Lending, Schad E Brannon, Business Funding Solutions, Roydon B Nelson, The Gold Collective, UIU Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - BFS - Articles of Incorp, #2 Exhibit 2 - BLOX - Articles of Organization - BLOX Lending LLC-3, #3 Exhibit 3 - BLOX - Operating Agreement -- BLOX Lending LLC Executed, #4 Exhibit 4 - DCH #1) 17 MAY_DLI_CORPORATE RESOLUTION_vAppt of Consultant, #5 Exhibit 5 - DCH #2) 31 MAY_Digital Commodity Software House (FZE) Formation Licsence, #6 Exhibit 6 - DCH #3) 31 MAY_DLI_CORPORATE RESOLUTION_vTransfer of Shares, #7 Exhibit 7 - DCH #6) 14 OCT_DLI_DCSH_CORPORATE RESOLUTION_vRe-Transfer of Shares, #8 Exhibit 8 - TGC - Formation Documents, #9 Exhibit 9 - UIU - 2023-09-18 11-26, #10 Exhibit 10 - Ignis Energy - Formation Documents, #11 Exhibit 11 - Ignis Loan Document, #12 Exhibit 12 - Intellectual Property MOU, #13 Exhibit 13 - BFS - Operating Agreement, #14 Exhibit 14 - TGC Resolution 4-10-2023)(Ross, David)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 161 STATUS REPORT Temporary Receiver's Interim Status Report by Josias N. Dewey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Counterclaim, #3 Exhibit 3 - August 14 Email, #4 Exhibit 4 - August 17 Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - Magee Email, #6 Exhibit 6 - BLM Shutdowns, #7 Exhibit 7 - BLM Lease Denial)(McNeill, Jason)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Motions No Longer Referred: #159 MOTION to Amend/Correct #121 Temporary Restraining Order (Dissolve) (mjm)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MOTION to Amend/Correct #121 Temporary Restraining Order (Dissolve) filed by Defendant Matthew D Fritzsche. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Grundvig, Adam)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING ON MOTION re: #145 MOTION to Amend/Correct #121 Temporary Restraining Order(Dissolve) Temporary Restraining Order Filed by Defendants Travis A Flaherty, IX Global, Joseph A Martinez AND #132 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Dissolve) #121 Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION to Appoint New Receiver filed by Defendants Jacob S Anderson, Jason R. Anderson, Blox Lending, Schad E Brannon, Business Funding Solutions, Roydon B Nelson, The Gold Collective, UIU Holdings. : (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) ZOOM Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2023 at 01:00 PM (MST) in US District Court-SLCU *virtual Court Via Zoom Conference* before Judge Robert J. Shelby. ZOOM information will be emailed to counsel. (mjm)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #149 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffrey D. Brooks for Jacob S Anderson, Jason R. Anderson, Blox Lending, Schad E Brannon, Business Funding Solutions, Roydon B Nelson, The Gold Collective, UIU Holdings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/18/23 (alt)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #155 Stipulated Motion for Temporary Order Re: Defendant Matthew D. Fritzsche's Living Expenses. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/20/23 (alt)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Stipulated MOTION for Temporary Order Regarding Defendant Matthew D. Fritzsche's Living Expenses filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Regarding Living Expenses) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Welsh, Michael)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine E. Pepin on behalf of B&B Investment Group (Pepin, Katherine)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Brady on behalf of B&B Investment Group (Brady, Thomas)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith M. Woodwell on behalf of B&B Investment Group (Woodwell, Keith)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Shelby: Status Conference held via ZOOM on 9/18/2023. The parties updated the court on their meet and confer. The parties will inform the court if they need another status conference scheduled for 5:00 p.m. September 19. The court discussed procedures and expectations for the preliminary injunction hearing. Briefing on the Motions to Dissolve, docket entry #132 and #145 is no longer stayed, and the court set the following schedule. The SEC must respond to both Motions to Dissolve no later than September 27, 2023. Replies if any are due October 3, 2023. The court will hold a ZOOM hearing on the Motions to Dissolve on October 6, 2023 at 1:00 p.m. (MST). The Receiver must respond to the relevant portions of the first Motion to Dissolve, docket entry #132 no later than September 27, 2023. The Receiver need not respond to the request to substitute for local counsel. A Reply if any is due October 3, 2023. Defendants who wish to seek relief similar to the relief sought in the Motions to Dissolve should file an appropriate filing no later than September 20, 2023. See DUCivR 7-1(a)(7). Counsel for SEC: Casey Fronk. Counsel for Defendants The Gold Collective, Blox Lending, Business Funding Solutions, UIU Holdings, Jason R. Anderson, Jacob S. Anderson, Schad E. Brannon, and Roydon B. Nelson: Jeffrey D. Brooks and Alexander R. Yarm; Counsel for Defendants Benjamin F. Daniels, Mark W. Schuler, Alton O. Parker, BW Holdings: Keith M. Woodwell; Counsel for Defendants iX Global, Joseph A. Martinez, Travis A. Flaherty, and Flaherty Enterprises: Romaine C. Marshall and Jose A. Abarca; Counsel for Defendant Brendan J. Stangis: Brennan J. Curtis; Counsel for Defendant Matthew D. Fritzsche: Adam Lee Grundvig; Counsel for Defendant Ryan Bowen: Emily Brinn Nuvan. Counsel for Receiver: Jessica B. Magee and Jason A. McNeill. Court reporter: Kelly Hicken.(mjm)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Jacob S Anderson, Jason R. Anderson, Blox Lending, Schad E Brannon, Business Funding Solutions, Roydon B Nelson, The Gold Collective, UIU Holdings re #132 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Dissolve) #121 Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Appoint New Receiver (Gottlieb, Jason)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey D. Brooks , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4812950,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Jacob S Anderson, Jason R. Anderson, Blox Lending, Schad E Brannon, Business Funding Solutions, Roydon B Nelson, The Gold Collective, UIU Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting PHV Admission of J. Brooks)(Lewis, Matthew)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 148 **SEALED DOCUMENT** filed by Defendant Matthew D FritzscheNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Grundvig, Adam)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Minute entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Shelby: Status Conference held via ZOOM on 9/15/2023. Counsel appear via Zoom. The court and counsel discuss possible briefing and hearing schedules. The court set the following schedule. By next Friday, September 22, the parties will meet and confer and agree upon what will be completed during expedited discovery. The court will hold a hearing every day at 5:00 p.m. September 18-22 where the parties will report on their progress and raise issues they would like the court to address. The hearings will be noticed daily, and the parties may inform the court if the daily meeting is unnecessary. Expedited discovery will occur September 22 through October 6. On October 13, the SEC will file its opening brief in support of a motion for preliminary injunction. Any opposition to the motion will be due October 20. The SECs reply, if any, will be due October 25. The court will hold a preliminary injunction hearing on October 30. The court GRANTED an oral motion to extend time for Defendants to respond to the Motions to Clarify the Receivership docket entry #125 ; docket entry #144 . Defendants may jointly respond to both Motions on or before September 22, 2023. The court also GRANTED an oral motion to extend time for Defendants to respond to the Complaint. Defendants may file answers or other responses to the Complaint on or before October 6, 2023. To promote judicial efficiency, all Defendants agreed Romaine C. Marshall will serve as coordinating counsel for Defendants not represented by Morrison Cohen LLP (i.e., all Defendants besides Digital Licensing, Jason Anderson, Jacob Anderson, Schad Brannon, and Roydon Nelson). Briefing on the Receivers Motion for Contempt/Sanctions, docket entry #138 will continue on a normal briefing schedule. Briefing is STAYED on the Motions to Dissolve, docket entry #132 ; docket entry #145 . The court will review the Motions to Dissolve and inform the parties how it plans to proceed on those Motions. Jason P. Gottlieb requested modifications to the TRO. Concerning business expenses, Mr. Gottlieb agreed to work with the Receiver. Concerning other requests, the court invited counsel to submit additional information for the court to review in camera. Counsel for SEC: Michael Edward Welsh and Casey Fronk. Counsel for Defendants Blox Lending, Business Funding Solutions, UIU Holdings, Jason R. Anderson, Jacob S. Anderson, Schad E. Brannon, and Roydon B. Nelson: Jason P. Gottlieb, David E. Ross, Alexander R. Yarm, and local counsel Matthew R. Lewis; Counsel for Defendants IX Global, Joseph A. Martinez, Travis A. Flaherty, and Flaherty Enterprises: Romaine C. Marshall and Jose A. Abarca; Counsel for Defendant Brendan J. Stangis: Brent R. Baker; Counsel for Matthew D. Fritzsche: Adam Lee Grundvig; Counsel for Defendant Ryan Bowen: Emily Brinn Nuvan; Counsel for Defendants Benjamin F. Daniels, Mark W. Schuler, Alton O. Parker, and BW Holdings: Thomas A. Brady and Katherine E. Pepin; Counsel for Receiver: Jessica B. Magee and Jason A. McNeill. Court reporter: Kelly Hicken.(mjm)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Motions No Longer Referred: #145 MOTION to Amend/Correct #121 Temporary Restraining Order (Dissolve) Temporary Restraining Order, #144 MOTION to Clarify Receivership Order (mjw)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION to Amend/Correct #121 Temporary Restraining Order (Dissolve) Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendants Travis A Flaherty, IX Global, Joseph A Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Joseph Martinez, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Joseph Martinez, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Joseph Martinez, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Joseph Martinez) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Abarca, Jose)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MOTION to Clarify Receivership Order filed by Receiver Josias N. Dewey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Dewey Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Clarify) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(McNeill, Jason)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #141 Motion for Leave to File Asset Accounting Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/14/23 (alt)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Motions No Longer Referred: #138 MOTION for Contempt Sanctions to be Entered against Jason R. Anderson, Jacob S. Anderson, Schad E. Brannon, and Roydon B. Nelson (mjw)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Asset Accounting filed by Defendant Matthew D Fritzsche. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Grundvig, Adam)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #137 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Ryan Bowen - answer due 10/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/14/23 (alt)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 139 STATUS REPORT Temporary Receiver's First Status Report by Josias N. Dewey. (McNeill, Jason)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MOTION for Contempt/Sanctions to be Entered against Defendants Jason R. Anderson, Jacob S. Anderson, Schad E. Brannon, and Roydon B. Nelson filed by Receiver Josias N. Dewey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - August 7 Email, #2 Exhibit 2 - August 9 Email, #3 Exhibit 3 - August 11 Email, #4 Exhibit 4 - August 19 Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - August 21 Email, #6 Exhibit 6 - August 22 Email Redacted, #7 Exhibit 7 - August 22 Email, #8 Exhibit 8 - August 29 Email, #9 Exhibit 9 - Counterclaim, #10 Exhibit 10 - ATLA Settlement Statement and Note, #11 Exhibit 11 - Archer Drilling Resolution, #12 Exhibit 12 - Commercial Mortgage, #13 Exhibit 13 - August 17 Letter to Receiver, #14 Exhibit 14 - Notice of Foreclosure) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(McNeill, Jason) Modified on 9/14/2023: updated motion relief to "Sanctions" (alt)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, filed by Defendant Ryan Bowen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Windham, Maria)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 136 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/12/23 (alt)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Brinn Nuvan on behalf of Ryan Bowen (Nuvan, Emily)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) ZOOM Status Conference set for 9/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in US District Court-SLCU *virtual Court Via Zoom Conference* before Judge Robert J. Shelby. The court anticipates setting a briefing and hearing schedule re: the Motion to Dissolve, docket entry #132 . ZOOM Information will be emailed to counsel. (mjm)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/12/2023. (mjm)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Dissolve) #121 Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support, MOTION to Appoint (New) Receiver and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Jacob S Anderson, Jason R. Anderson, Blox Lending, Schad E Brannon, Business Funding Solutions, Roydon B Nelson, The Gold Collective, UIU Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DEBT-lite-paper, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ex parte TRO hearing SEC V DIGITAL7-28-23, #3 Exhibit 3 - Bank Closure Documents, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Emily Tabor-Eads, #5 Exhibit 5 - Composite - Corporate Resolution, Formation License, #6 Exhibit 6 - DLI - FLEET RFEG press release, #7 Exhibit 7 -Mining Magazine FLEET_RFEG_Press Release, #8 Exhibit 8 - DLI - Brannon memo re replacement, #9 Exhibit 9 - Renegade Pitchbook, #10 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Derrick Hope, #11 Exhibit 11 - SEC v. DLI Letter to SEC re ordinary course payments, #12 Exhibit 12 -Declaration of Jason Saetrum, #13 Exhibit 13 - Handwritten threat (redacted), #14 Exhibit 14 - DEBT Market Cap Calculations, #15 Exhibit 15 - SEC Subpoena Gordan L Anderson, #16 Exhibit 16 - 2023-08-23 Letter DEBT Box Receiver to Saetrum, #17 Exhibit 17 - RE MC+HK Call email, #18 Exhibit 18 - Part 2 -August 17th Letter to Receiver, #19 Exhibit 19 - RE_ SEC v. Digital Licensing, #20 Exhibit 20 - RE_ SEC v. Digital Licensing Inc., et al., #21 Exhibit 21 - RE_ SEC v. Digital Licensing - Urgent Call, #22 Exhibit Ex. 22 - RE_ SEC v. Digital Licensing - Urgent Call)(Gottlieb, Jason) Modified on 9/12/2023: corrected entry text and motion relief (alt)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #130 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. The document Memorandum in Opposition has been stricken, filed using the wrong event. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading as a new motion. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (nl)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Modification of Docket re #132 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Dissolve) #121 Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Appoint New Receiver. Error: Motion was linked incorrectly and second relief should not have been "Miscellaneous Relief". Correction: Entry corrected to link only to current #121 TRO, second motion relief corrected to "Appoint Receiver" with the word "New" added for clarification, and entry text edited to to remove incorrectly added text repeating title of document. (alt)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STRICKEN-PARTIES TO DISREGARD MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #119 Stipulated MOTION For Temporary Order Regarding Defendant Jason R. Anderson, Jacob S. Anderson, Schad E. Brannon, and Roydon B. Nelson's Living Expenses, #109 Stipulated MOTION For Temporary Order Regarding Defendant Ryan Bowen's Living Expenses , #110 Stipulated MOTION for Temporary Order Regarding Defendant Travis Flaherty's Living Expenses ( Defendants' Motion to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order and Modify Temporary Receivership Order to Appoint a New Receiver; and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof Expeditious Consideration Requested) filed by Defendants Jacob S Anderson, Jason R. Anderson, Blox Lending, Schad E Brannon, Business Funding Solutions, Roydon B Nelson, The Gold Collective, UIU Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DEBT-lite-paper, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ex parte TRO hearing SEC V DIGITAL7-28-23, #3 Exhibit 3 - Bank Closure Documents, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Emily Tabor-Eads, #5 Exhibit 5 - Composite - Corporate Resolution, Formation License, #6 Exhibit 6 - DLI - FLEET RFEG press release, #7 Exhibit 7 -Mining Magazine FLEET_RFEG_Press Release, #8 Exhibit 8 - DLI - Brannon memo re replacement, #9 Exhibit 9 - Renegade Pitchbook, #10 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Derrick Hope, #11 Exhibit 11 - SEC v. DLI Letter to SEC re ordinary course payments, #12 Exhibit 12 -Declaration of Jason Saetrum, #13 Exhibit 13 - Handwritten threat (redacted), #14 Exhibit 14 - DEBT Market Cap Calculations, #15 Exhibit 15 - SEC Subpoena Gordan L Anderson, #16 Exhibit 16 - 2023-08-23 Letter DEBT Box Receiver to Saetrum, #17 Exhibit 17 - RE MC+HK Call email, #18 Exhibit 18 - Part 2 -August 17th Letter to Receiver, #19 Exhibit 19 - RE_ SEC v. Digital Licensing, #20 Exhibit 20 - RE_ SEC v. Digital Licensing Inc., et al., #21 Exhibit 21 - RE_ SEC v. Digital Licensing - Urgent Call, #22 Exhibit 22 - RE_ SEC v. Digital Licensing - Urgent Call)(Gottlieb, Jason) Modified on 9/12/2023 stricken, 131 Notice of Deficiency filed, attorney to file using correct motion event(nl).
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #128 Motion for Temporary Order Re: Joseph A. Martinez and iX Global LLC Living Expenses. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/6/23 (alt)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Stipulated MOTION For Temporary Order Regarding Defendants Joseph A. Martinez and IX Global, LLC Living Expenses filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Regarding Living Expenses)(Welsh, Michael)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine E. Pepin on behalf of BW Holdings, Benjamin F Daniels, Alton O Parker, Mark W Schuler (Pepin, Katherine)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Brady on behalf of BW Holdings, Benjamin F Daniels, Alton O Parker, Mark W Schuler (Brady, Thomas)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Plaintiff's MOTION to Clarify Receivership Order re #10 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - J. Dewey Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1-17 to J. Dewey Decl., #3 Exhibit 18-33 to J. Dewey Decl., #4 Exhibit B - Letter re Business Payments, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Amended Temporary Receivership Order)(Welsh, Michael)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #123 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Ryan Bowen may file his answer or other responsive pleading on or before September 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/30/2023. (jl)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, filed by Defendant Ryan Bowen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Windham, Maria)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith M. Woodwell on behalf of BW Holdings, Benjamin F Daniels, Alton O Parker, Mark W Schuler (Woodwell, Keith)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 121 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/29/2023. (jl)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 120 TEMPORARY ORDER REGARDING LIVING EXPENSES re #119 Motion For Temporary Order. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/29/2023. (jl)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Stipulated MOTION For Temporary Order Regarding Defendant Jason R. Anderson, Jacob S. Anderson, Schad E. Brannon, and Roydon B. Nelson's Living Expenses filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Regarding Living Expenses)(Welsh, Michael)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 118 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #115 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document: Based on the parties' stipulation and good cause appearing, the court GRANTS the Motion and orders the document at issue ( #117 ) shall remain sealed. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/29/2023. No attached document. (jl)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 117 **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #115 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Supplemental Asset Accounting for Defendants IX Global LLC, #116 Notice of Filing filed by Defendant IX Global NOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Abarca, Jose)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE OF FILING of REDACTED Supplemental Asset Accounting re #115 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Supplemental Asset Accounting for Defendants IX Global LLC filed by Defendant IX Global. (Abarca, Jose)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Supplemental Asset Accounting for Defendants IX Global LLC filed by Defendant IX Global. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abarca, Jose)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #108 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re Complaint. The Defendants and Relief Defendants listed in the order shall have until September 22, 2023 to file their answer or otherwise respond to the complaint filed in this matter. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/28/2023. (jl)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Regarding Defendant Travis Flaherty's Living Expenses re #110 Motion. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/28/2023. (jl)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Temporary ORDER Regarding Defendant Ryan Bowen's Living Expenses re #109 Motion. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/28/2023. (jl)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Zoom Status Conference held on 07/28/2023 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Court Reporter/Transcriber KELLY BROWN HICKEN, RPR, RMR, Telephone number 801-521-7238. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. To redact additional information a Motion to Redact must be filed. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/15/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/6/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2023. (jl)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Stipulated MOTION for Temporary Order Regarding Defendant Travis Flaherty's Living Expenses filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Temporary Order Regarding Living Expenses)(Welsh, Michael)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Stipulated MOTION For Temporary Order Regarding Defendant Ryan Bowen's Living Expenses filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Temporary Order Regarding Living Expenses)(Welsh, Michael)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Jacob S Anderson, Jason R. Anderson, Blox Lending, Schad E Brannon, Business Funding Solutions, Roydon B Nelson, The Gold Collective, UIU Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Lewis, Matthew)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Matthew Fritzsche may file his answer or other responsive pleading on or before September 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/24/2023. (jl)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Matthew D Fritzsche. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Adam Lee Grundvig added to party Matthew D Fritzsche(pty:dft)(Grundvig, Adam)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #104 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Ryan Bowen may file his answer or other responsive pleading on or before August 30, 2023. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/23/2023. (jl)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, filed by Defendant Ryan Bowen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toth, Justin)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #92 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Brendan J. Stangis may file his answer or other responsive pleading on or before September 22, 2023. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/22/2023. (jl)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #97 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Based on the parties' stipulation and good cause appearing, the court GRANTS the Motion and orders the documents at issue ( #98 , #99 , #100 , #101 ) shall remain sealed. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/23/2023. No attached document. (jl)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #93 Notice of Filing, #97 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Asset Accountings filed by Defendant Jacob S AndersonNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Lewis, Matthew)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #94 Notice of Filing, #97 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Asset Accountings filed by Defendant Jason R. AndersonNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Lewis, Matthew)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #96 Notice of Filing, #97 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Asset Accountings filed by Defendant Roydon B NelsonNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Lewis, Matthew)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #95 Notice of Filing, #97 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Asset Accountings filed by Defendant Schad E BrannonNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Lewis, Matthew)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Asset Accountings filed by Defendants Jacob S Anderson, Jason R. Anderson, Schad E Brannon, Roydon B Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Leave to File the Accountings of Jason Anderson, Jacob Anderson, Schad Brannon, and Roydon Nelson Under Seal)(Lewis, Matthew)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE OF FILING of Accounting of Assets for Roydon B. Nelson filed by Defendant Roydon B Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Accounting of Assets re Roydon Nelson (Redacted))(Lewis, Matthew)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE OF FILING of Accounting of Assets for Schad E. Brannon filed by Defendant Schad E Brannon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Accounting of Assets re Schad Brannon (Redacted))(Lewis, Matthew)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE OF FILING of Accounting of Assets for Jason R. Anderson filed by Defendant Jason R. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Accounting of Assets re Jason Anderson (Redacted))(Lewis, Matthew)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE OF FILING of Accounting of Assets for Jacob S. Anderson filed by Defendant Jacob S Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Accounting of Assets re Jacob Anderson (Redacted))(Lewis, Matthew)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #16 Summons Returned Executed, #1 Complaint,, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Brendan J Stangis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Brent)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #90 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan E. Schmalfeld for Travis A Flaherty, for Flaherty Enterprises, for IX Global, and for Joseph A Martinez.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/22/2023. (jl)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan E. Schmalfeld , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4783876,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Travis A Flaherty, Flaherty Enterprises, James E Franklin, Matthew D Fritzsche, IX Global, IX Ventures FZCO, Joseph A Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Romaine) Modified by striking parties not being represented by counsel on 8/22/2023 (jl).
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #82 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Based on the parties' stipulation and good cause appearing, the court GRANTS the Motion and orders the documents at issue ( #84 , #86 , #88 ) shall remain sealed. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/21/2023. No attached document. (jl)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #87 Notice of Filing, filed by Defendant Travis A FlahertyNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Abarca, Jose)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE OF FILING of Accounting of Assets re #82 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Asset Accountings for Defendants IX Global LLC, Joseph A. Martinez, and Travis Flaherty for Defendant Travis Flaherty filed by Defendant Travis A Flaherty. (Abarca, Jose)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #85 Notice of Filing, filed by Defendant Joseph A MartinezNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Abarca, Jose)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE OF FILING of Accounting of Assets re #82 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Asset Accountings for Defendants IX Global LLC, Joseph A. Martinez, and Travis Flaherty for Defendant Joseph A. Martinez filed by Defendant Joseph A Martinez. (Abarca, Jose)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #83 Notice of Filing, filed by Defendant IX Global NOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Abarca, Jose)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE OF FILING of Accounting of Assets re #82 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Asset Accountings for Defendants IX Global LLC, Joseph A. Martinez, and Travis Flaherty for Defendant iX Global LLC filed by Defendant IX Global. (Abarca, Jose)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Asset Accountings for Defendants IX Global LLC, Joseph A. Martinez, and Travis Flaherty filed by Defendants Travis A Flaherty, Flaherty Enterprises, James E Franklin, Matthew D Fritzsche, IX Global, IX Ventures FZCO, Joseph A Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abarca, Jose) Modified on 8/22/2023 parties stricken not represented by counsel(nl).
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #67 Sealed Document, 61 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document, filed by Defendant Ryan BowenNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Toth, Justin)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Supplemental Accounting of Assets for Defendant Ryan Bowen (Redacted) by Ryan Bowen re #66 Notice of Filing (Toth, Justin)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. See order for details. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/17/2023. (jl)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting Stipulated #65 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Based on the parties' stipulation and good cause appearing, the court GRANTS the Motion and orders that the #73 document at issue shall remain sealed. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/16/2023. No attached document. (jl)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #72 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason P. Gottlieb for Jacob S Anderson, for Jason R. Anderson, for Blox Lending, for Schad E Brannon, for Business Funding Solutions, for Roydon B Nelson, for The Gold Collective, and for UIU Holdings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/16/2023. (jl)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David E. Ross for Jacob S Anderson, for Jason R. Anderson, for Blox Lending, for Schad E Brannon, for Business Funding Solutions, for Roydon B Nelson, for The Gold Collective, and for UIU Holdings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/16/2023. (jl)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alexander R. Yarm for Jacob S Anderson, for Jason R. Anderson, for Blox Lending, for Schad E Brannon, Yarm for Business Funding Solutions, for Roydon B Nelson, for The Gold Collective, and for UIU Holdings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/16/2023. (jl)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #65 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re #64 NOTICE OF FILING filed by Defendant Brendan J StangisNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Accounting of Stangis)(Baker, Brent) Modified by linking to #65 on 8/16/2023 (jl).
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason P. Gottlieb , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4778800,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Jacob S Anderson, Jason R. Anderson, Blox Lending, Schad E Brannon, Business Funding Solutions, Roydon B Nelson, The Gold Collective, UIU Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PHV App re J. Gottlieb, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jason P. Gottlieb)(Lewis, Matthew)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David E. Ross , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4778714,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Jacob S Anderson, Jason R. Anderson, Blox Lending, Schad E Brannon, Business Funding Solutions, Roydon B Nelson, The Gold Collective, UIU Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PHV App re D. Ross, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of David E. Ross)(Lewis, Matthew)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexander R. Yarm , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4778628,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Jacob S Anderson, Jason R. Anderson, Blox Lending, Schad E Brannon, Business Funding Solutions, Roydon B Nelson, The Gold Collective, UIU Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PHV App re A. Yarm, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Alexander R. Yarm)(Lewis, Matthew)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor J. Smith on behalf of Jacob S Anderson, Jason R. Anderson, Blox Lending, Schad E Brannon, Business Funding Solutions, Roydon B Nelson, The Gold Collective, UIU Holdings (Smith, Taylor)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Lewis on behalf of Jacob S Anderson, Jason R. Anderson, Blox Lending, Schad E Brannon, Business Funding Solutions, Roydon B Nelson, The Gold Collective, UIU Holdings (Lewis, Matthew)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 **SEALED DOCUMENT** re 61 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document, #60 Sealed Document filed by Defendant Ryan BowenNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Toth, Justin)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE OF FILING of Amended Accounting of Assets for Defendant Ryan Bowen (Redacted) re #58 Notice of Filing Accounting of Assets for Defendant Ryan Bowen filed by Defendant Ryan Bowen. (Toth, Justin)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re #64 NOTICE OF FILING filed by Defendant Brendan J Stangis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Brent) Modified by linking to #64 on 8/16/2023 (jl).
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF FILING of Accounting of Assets for Defendant Brendan J. Stangis Redacted filed by Defendant Brendan J Stangis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Accounting)(Baker, Brent)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent R. Baker on behalf of Brendan J Stangis (Baker, Brent)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Scott Gordon filed by Scott B. Gordon on behalf of Ryan Bowen (Gordon, Scott)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #59 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Based on the parties' stipulation and good cause appearing, the court GRANTS the Motion and orders that the document at issue ( #60 ) shall remain sealed. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/15/2023. No attached document. (jl)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE of Rejected Service of Process from CT Corporation regarding party Blox Lending. (jl)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #58 Notice of Filing filed by Defendant Ryan BowenNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Toth, Justin)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document re #58 Notice of Filing Accounting of Assets for Defendant Ryan Bowen filed by Defendant Ryan Bowen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toth, Justin)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE OF FILING of Accounting of Assets for Defendant Ryan Bowen (Redacted) filed by Defendant Ryan Bowen. (Toth, Justin)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. Windham on behalf of Ryan Bowen (Windham, Maria)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin T. Toth on behalf of Ryan Bowen (Toth, Justin)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott B. Gordon on behalf of Ryan Bowen (Gordon, Scott)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Romaine C. Marshall on behalf of IX Global, IX Ventures FZCO, Joseph A Martinez (Marshall, Romaine) Modified by striking party as per document and conversation with counsel they are not representing IX Ventures on 8/9/2023 (jl).
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Romaine C. Marshall on behalf of Travis A Flaherty, Flaherty Enterprises (Marshall, Romaine)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose A. Abarca on behalf of IX Global, IX Ventures FZCO, Joseph A Martinez (Abarca, Jose) Modified by striking through party that attorney is not representing per document and conversation with counsel on 8/9/2023 (jl).
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose A. Abarca on behalf of Travis A Flaherty, Flaherty Enterprises (Abarca, Jose)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to The Gold Collective served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 The Gold Collective Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Roydon B Nelson served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Roydon Nelson Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to UIU Holdings served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 UIU Holdings Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Jason R. Anderson served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Jason Anderson Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Business Funding Solutions served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Business Funding Solutions Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Blox Lending served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Blox Lending Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Ryan Bowen served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Ryan Bowen Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Calmfritz Holdings served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Calmfritz Holdings Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Matthew D Fritzsche served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Matthew Fritzsche Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to BW Holdings served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 BW Holdings Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to B&B Investment Group served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 B&B Investments Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Benjamin F Daniels served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Benjamin Daniels Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to IX Global Waiver sent on 8/7/2023, answer due 10/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service of Summons)(Welsh, Michael)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Joseph A Martinez Waiver sent on 8/7/2023, answer due 10/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service of Summons)(Welsh, Michael)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew W. Balthazor for Josias N. Dewey.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/07/2023. (jl)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Scott Mascianica for Josias N. Dewey.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/07/2023. (jl)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jessica B. Magee for Josias N. Dewey.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/07/2023. (jl)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. See order for details. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/07/2023. (jl)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew W. Balthazor , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4769553,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Receiver Josias N. Dewey. (Attachments: #1 Application for PHV Andrew Balthazor, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting PHV Andrew Balthazor)(McNeill, Jason)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott Mascianica , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4769525,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Receiver Josias N. Dewey. (Attachments: #1 Application for PHV Scott Mascianica, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting PHV Scott Mascianica)(McNeill, Jason)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jessica B. Magee , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4769451,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Receiver Josias N. Dewey. (Attachments: #1 Application for PHV Admission Jessica Magee, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting PHV Admission Jessica Magee)(McNeill, Jason)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric K. Schnibbe on behalf of Josias N. Dewey (Schnibbe, Eric)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. McNeill on behalf of Josias N. Dewey (McNeill, Jason)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Western Oil Exploration served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Western Oil Exploration Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Archer Drilling served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Archer Drilling Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Flaherty Enterprises served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Flaherty Enterprises Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Digital Licensing served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Digital Licensing Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Purdy Oil served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Purdy Oil Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Mark W Schuler served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Mark William Schuler Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Jacob S Anderson served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Jacob Anderson Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Calmes & Co served on 8/3/2023, answer due 8/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Calmes & Co. Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Alton O Parker served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Alton Parker Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Schad E Brannon served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Schad Brannon Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Travis A Flaherty served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Travis Flaherty Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Brendan J Stangis served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brendan Stangis Executed Return of Service)(Welsh, Michael)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF Unsealing Civil Case. (jl)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Unseal Case - this matter is no longer under seal. The case docket and the automated case index shall be unsealed. All filings from this date forward may be effected in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the local rules of practice of this Court. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 08/02/2023. (jl)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Unseal Case filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (jl)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING ON MOTION (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) SEALED Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2023 at 03:00 PM in US District Court-SLCU *virtual Court Via Zoom Conference* before Judge Robert J. Shelby. ZOOM Information will be emailed to counsel. (mjm)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Shelby: TRO Motion Hearing held via ZOOM on 7/28/2023 re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Securities and Exchange Commission and #4 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and Memorandum in Support filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. For the reasons stated on the record, the Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, docket entry #3 and Ex Parte Application for Appointment of a Temporary Receiver, docket entry #4 are granted. Counsel for Plaintiffs: Michael E. Welsh and Casey R. Fronk. Court Reporter: Kelly Hicken. (mjm)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appoint Receiver. Josias N. Dewey appointed as temporary receiver of Defendant Digital Licensing Inc. (d/b/a "Debt Box") and its subsidiaries and affiliates. (See order for other details.) Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 7/28/2023. (jwt)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and Orders (1) Freezing Assets; (2) Requiring Accountings; (3) Prohibiting the Destruction of Documents; and (4) Granting Expedited Discovery; (5) Repatriating Assets. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 7/28/2023. (jwt)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal Case. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is sealed until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 07/27/2023. (jl)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Reassigned. Case was incorrectly assigned to Judge Howard Nielson, Jr following Judge Ted Stewart's recusal. Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Case Reassigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Case number will now read 2:23-cv-00482-RJS. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (jwt)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Ted Stewart recused. Case reassigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 7/26/2023. (mh)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jacob S Anderson, Jason R. Anderson, Archer Drilling, B&B Investment Group, BW Holdings, Blox Lending, Ryan Bowen, Schad E Brannon, Business Funding Solutions, Calmes & Co, Calmfritz Holdings, Benjamin F Daniels, Digital Licensing, Travis A Flaherty, Flaherty Enterprises, James E Franklin, Matthew D Fritzsche, IX Global, IX Ventures FZCO, Joseph A Martinez, Roydon B Nelson, Alton O Parker, Purdy Oil, Mark W Schuler, Brendan J Stangis, The Gold Collective, UIU Holdings, Western Oil Exploration. (Attachments: #1 Archer Drilling, #2 B&B Investment Group, #3 Benjamin Daniels, #4 Blox Lending, #5 Brendan Stangis, #6 Business Funding Solutions, #7 BW Holdings, #8 Calmes & Co., #9 Calmfritz Holdings, #10 Digital Licensing, #11 Flaherty Enterprises, #12 IX Global, #13 IX Ventures, #14 Jacob S. Anderson, #15 James E. Franklin, #16 Jason R. Anderson, #17 Joseph A. Martinez, #18 Mark W. Schuler, #19 Matthew D. Fritzsche, #20 Purdy Oil, #21 Roydon B. Nelson, #22 Ryan Bowen, #23 Schad E. Brannon, #24 The Gold Collective, #25 Travis A. Flaherty, #26 UIU Holdings, #27 Western Oil Exploration Co.)(jwt)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Titanium Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Qualifications Letter)(jwt)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Rule 65 Attorney Certification, #3 Exhibit 1 - Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Joseph Watkins, #5 Exhibit 2 - Watkins Exhibits 1-14, #6 Exhibit 2 - Watkins Exhibits 15-30, #7 Exhibit 2 - Watkins Exhibits 31-32, #8 Exhibit 2 - Watkins Exhibits 33-34, #9 Exhibit 2 - Watkins Exhibits 35-50, #10 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Karaz S. Zaki, #11 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Jenny L. McBride)(jwt)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Case filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jwt)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Securities and Exchange Commission against Jacob S Anderson, Jason R. Anderson, Archer Drilling, B&B Investment Group, BW Holdings, Blox Lending, Ryan Bowen, Schad E Brannon, Business Funding Solutions, Calmes & Co, Calmfritz Holdings, Benjamin F Daniels, Digital Licensing, Travis A Flaherty, Flaherty Enterprises, James E Franklin, Matthew D Fritzsche, IX Global, IX Ventures FZCO, Joseph A Martinez, Roydon B Nelson, Alton O Parker, Purdy Oil, Mark W Schuler, Brendan J Stangis, The Gold Collective, UIU Holdings, Western Oil Exploration. (Filing fee $ 402) (Fee Status: Waived) (Electronic document provided on flash drive.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (jwt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Digital Licensing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Casey Fronk
Represented By: Michael Edward Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Licensing a Wyoming corporation doing business as Debt Box
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason R. Anderson
Represented By: Alexander R. Yarm
Represented By: Taylor J. Smith
Represented By: Jason P. Gottlieb
Represented By: Matthew R. Lewis
Represented By: David E. Ross
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob S Anderson
Represented By: Jason P. Gottlieb
Represented By: Matthew R. Lewis
Represented By: Alexander R. Yarm
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Brooks
Represented By: Taylor J. Smith
Represented By: David E. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schad E Brannon
Represented By: Alexander R. Yarm
Represented By: David E. Ross
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Brooks
Represented By: Taylor J. Smith
Represented By: Jason P. Gottlieb
Represented By: Matthew R. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roydon B Nelson
Represented By: Jason P. Gottlieb
Represented By: Matthew R. Lewis
Represented By: Alexander R. Yarm
Represented By: Taylor J. Smith
Represented By: David E. Ross
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Oil Exploration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Bowen
Represented By: Emily Brinn Nuvan
Represented By: Justin T. Toth
Represented By: Maria E. Windham
Represented By: Scott B. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IX Global
Represented By: Jose A. Abarca
Represented By: Romaine C. Marshall
Represented By: Jonathan E. Schmalfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A Martinez
Represented By: Romaine C. Marshall
Represented By: Jonathan E. Schmalfeld
Represented By: Jose A. Abarca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin F Daniels
Represented By: Katherine E. Pepin
Represented By: Thomas A. Brady
Represented By: Keith M. Woodwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark W Schuler
Represented By: Keith M. Woodwell
Represented By: Katherine E. Pepin
Represented By: Thomas A. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&B Investment Group a Utah limited liability company doing business as Core 1 Crypto
Represented By: Katherine E. Pepin
Represented By: Thomas A. Brady
Represented By: Keith M. Woodwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis A Flaherty
Represented By: Romaine C. Marshall
Represented By: Jonathan E. Schmalfeld
Represented By: Jose A. Abarca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alton O Parker
Represented By: Katherine E. Pepin
Represented By: Thomas A. Brady
Represented By: Keith M. Woodwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW Holdings a Utah limited liability company doing business as Fair Project
Represented By: Katherine E. Pepin
Represented By: Thomas A. Brady
Represented By: Keith M. Woodwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan J Stangis
Represented By: Brent R. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew D Fritzsche
Represented By: Adam Lee Grundvig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer Drilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business Funding Solutions
Represented By: Jason P. Gottlieb
Represented By: David E. Ross
Represented By: Matthew R. Lewis
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Brooks
Represented By: Alexander R. Yarm
Represented By: Taylor J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blox Lending
Represented By: Jason P. Gottlieb
Represented By: Matthew R. Lewis
Represented By: Alexander R. Yarm
Represented By: David E. Ross
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Brooks
Represented By: Taylor J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calmfritz Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calmes & Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flaherty Enterprises
Represented By: Romaine C. Marshall
Represented By: Jose A. Abarca
Represented By: Jonathan E. Schmalfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IX Ventures FZCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdy Oil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gold Collective
Represented By: Jason P. Gottlieb
Represented By: Matthew R. Lewis
Represented By: Alexander R. Yarm
Represented By: David E. Ross
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Brooks
Represented By: Taylor J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UIU Holdings
Represented By: Alexander R. Yarm
Represented By: David E. Ross
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Brooks
Represented By: Taylor J. Smith
Represented By: Jason P. Gottlieb
Represented By: Matthew R. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Josias N. Dewey
Represented By: Jason A. McNeill
Represented By: Andrew William Balthazor
Represented By: Eric K. Schnibbe
Represented By: Jessica B. Magee
Represented By: Scott Mascianica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?