Marmer et al v. Firmage et al
Plaintiff: Max Marmer, Jonathan Ronca, Gillian Pothier, Jeff Marmer, Peggeth Loeb, Joseph Reiss, Brandon Bozarth, Stanley Dawejko, Michael Pole and Multidimensional Capital
Defendant: Joseph P. Firmage, Robert A Richards, Kenneth E Wilber, Colin Bigelow, Integral Initiatives LLC, 21C Corporation, Science Invents LLC, Motion Physics LLC, Manyone LLC, Paula Collins, Paulette Collins, Virginia Menlove, Jairo Toro, David Hestenes, Michael May, River Judd, ManyOne World, LLC, Academy of Sciences and Arts, LLC doing business as Internasa and InterNASA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00580
Filed: August 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 0022 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2023 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon Bozarth, Jonathan Ronca, Max Marmer, Joseph Reiss, Michael Pole, Stanley Dawejko, Multidimensional Capital as to Jairo Toro served on 9/30/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. (Deiss, Andrew)
October 6, 2023 Filing 28 Summons Issued Electronically as to Paula Collins. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
October 6, 2023 Filing 27 Summons Issued Electronically as to 21C Corporation. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
October 6, 2023 Filing 26 Summons Issued Electronically as to Robert A Richards. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
October 6, 2023 Filing 25 RESPONSE re #8 Summons filed by Paula Collins. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(alf)
October 3, 2023 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon Bozarth, Jonathan Ronca, Max Marmer, Joseph Reiss, Michael Pole, Stanley Dawejko, Multidimensional Capital as to Academy of Sciences and Arts, LLC served on 9/21/2023, answer due 10/12/2023; Joseph P. Firmage served on 9/21/2023, answer due 10/12/2023; InterNASA, LLC served on 9/21/2023, answer due 10/12/2023; ManyOne World, LLC served on 9/21/2023, answer due 10/12/2023; Manyone LLC served on 9/21/2023, answer due 10/12/2023; Virginia Menlove served on 9/21/2023, answer due 10/12/2023; Motion Physics LLC served on 9/21/2023, answer due 10/12/2023; Science Invents LLC served on 9/21/2023, answer due 10/12/2023. (Deiss, Andrew)
September 28, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #22 Return of Service,. The document is stricken as improperly filed. Please refile using the event "Summons Returned Executed". The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (alf)
September 28, 2023 Filing 22 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Personal served on Joseph Firmage, Virginia Menlove, Motion Physics LLC, Science Invents LLC, ManyOne LLC, Academy of Science and Arts LLC, InterNASA LLC. on 9/21/2023, filed by Plaintiffs Brandon Bozarth, Stanley Dawejko, Max Marmer, Multidimensional Capital, Michael Pole, Joseph Reiss, Jonathan Ronca. (Deiss, Andrew) Modified on 9/28/2023 - stricken as improperly filed (alf).
September 20, 2023 Filing 21 Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael May. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
September 20, 2023 Filing 20 Summons Issued Electronically as to River Judd. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
September 14, 2023 Filing 19 Summons Issued Electronically as to Joseph P. Firmage. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
September 14, 2023 Filing 18 Summons Issued Electronically as to Virginia Menlove. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
September 14, 2023 Filing 17 Summons Issued Electronically as to Colin Bigelow. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
September 14, 2023 Filing 16 Summons Issued Electronically as to Kenneth E Wilber. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
September 14, 2023 Filing 15 Summons Issued Electronically as to Robert A Richards. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
September 14, 2023 Filing 14 Summons Issued Electronically as to 21C Corporation. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
September 14, 2023 Filing 13 Summons Issued Electronically as to Motion Physics LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
September 14, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to Manyone LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
September 14, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Issued Electronically as to Science Invents LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
September 14, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to ManyOne World, LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
September 14, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Integral Initiatives LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
September 14, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Paula Collins. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
September 14, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to David Hestenes. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
September 14, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to InterNASA, LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
September 14, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Academy of Sciences and Arts, LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
September 14, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jairo Toro. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
September 5, 2023 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 21C Corporation, Colin Bigelow, Joseph P. Firmage, Integral Initiatives LLC, Manyone LLC, Motion Physics LLC, Robert A Richards, Science Invents LLC, Kenneth E Wilber, Paula Collins, Virginia Menlove, Jairo Toro, David Hestenes, Michael May, River Judd, ManyOne World, LLC, Academy of Sciences and Arts, LLC, InterNASA, LLC. Removed Plaintiffs: Gillian Pothier, Jeff Marmer, Peggeth Loeb. New Defendants: Paula Collins, Virginia Menlove, Jairo Toro, David Hestenes, Michael May, River Judd, ManyOne World, LLC, Academy of Sciences and Arts, LLC, InterNASA, LLC. filed by Brandon Bozarth, Jonathan Ronca, Max Marmer, Joseph Reiss, Michael Pole, Stanley Dawejko, Multidimensional Capital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Deiss, Andrew)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/31/2023. (alf)
August 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4795210) filed by Brandon Bozarth, Jonathan Ronca, Max Marmer, Joseph Reiss, Gillian Pothier, Michael Pole, Stanley Dawejko, Jeff Marmer, Multidimensional Capital, Peggeth Loeb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Deiss, Andrew)
August 30, 2023 Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett added. Case number will now read 2:23-cv-00580-JCB. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (haa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marmer et al v. Firmage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Marmer
Represented By: Andrew G. Deiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Ronca
Represented By: Andrew G. Deiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gillian Pothier
Represented By: Andrew G. Deiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Marmer
Represented By: Andrew G. Deiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggeth Loeb
Represented By: Andrew G. Deiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Reiss
Represented By: Andrew G. Deiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Bozarth
Represented By: Andrew G. Deiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Dawejko
Represented By: Andrew G. Deiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pole
Represented By: Andrew G. Deiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Multidimensional Capital
Represented By: Andrew G. Deiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Firmage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth E Wilber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Bigelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integral Initiatives LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21C Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Science Invents LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motion Physics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manyone LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulette Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Menlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jairo Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hestenes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ManyOne World, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Academy of Sciences and Arts, LLC doing business as Internasa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InterNASA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?