Adams Martinez v. Crabtree et al
Plaintiff: Didier Josue Adams Martinez
Defendant: Michael Crabtree, Ur Jaddou, Merrick B. Garland and Christopher A Wray
Case Number: 2:2023cv00635
Filed: September 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1447 Request for Naturalilzation Hearing
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is remanded to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and dismissed without prejudice. Case Closed. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/19/23. (dle)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Joint Motion to Remand and Dismiss Proceedings Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/19/23. (dle)
October 19, 2023 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Remand to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services , Joint MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice filed by Defendants Michael Crabtree, Merrick B. Garland, Ur Jaddou, Christopher A Wray. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Hans)
October 19, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Hans H. Chen on behalf of Michael Crabtree, Merrick B. Garland, Ur Jaddou, Christopher A Wray (Chen, Hans)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/16/2023. (nl)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/13/2023. (lwh)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/13/2023. (lwh)
September 25, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Didier Josue Adams Martinez. Merrick B. Garland served on 9/25/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Summons, #2 Exhibit Proof of Delivery)(Anderson, Skyler)
September 25, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Didier Josue Adams Martinez. Christopher A Wray served on 9/25/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Summons, #2 Exhibit Proof of Delivery)(Anderson, Skyler)
September 25, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Didier Josue Adams Martinez. Ur Jaddou served on 9/25/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Summons, #2 Exhibit Proof of Delivery)(Anderson, Skyler)
September 25, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Didier Josue Adams Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Summons, #2 Exhibit Proof of Delivery)(Anderson, Skyler)
September 25, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Didier Josue Adams Martinez. Michael Crabtree served on 9/22/2023, answer due 11/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Summons, #2 Exhibit Proof of Delivery)(Anderson, Skyler)
September 19, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Merrick B. Garland. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
September 19, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Christopher A Wray. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
September 19, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ur Jaddou. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
September 19, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael Crabtree. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
September 19, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to The Civil Process Clerk for the U.S. Attorney's office - Merrick B. Garland. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
September 18, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4812877) filed by Didier Josue Adams Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Anderson, Skyler)
September 18, 2023 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff Didier Josue Adams Martinez is directed to E-File the complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (haa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams Martinez v. Crabtree et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Didier Josue Adams Martinez
Represented By: Skyler K. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Crabtree
Represented By: Hans H. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Jaddou
Represented By: Hans H. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland
Represented By: Hans H. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A Wray
Represented By: Hans H. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?