Mazzetti v. Powell et al
Plaintiff: James Armond Mazzetti, III
Defendant: Robert Powell, Randy Patton, Matthew Lambert, Nick Daniels, Cameron Dexter and FNU Hardy
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2023cv00725
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2023 Filing 7 Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $ 15.50 received, receipt number 4342 (haa)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: On October 12, 2023, based on Plaintiff's Authorization, Consent and Declaration, and Financial Certificate, Plaintiff's inmate-accounting office was authorized and requested to within thirty days remit Plaintiff's $15.50 initial partial filing fee (IPFF). (ECF Nos. 3, 5.) Plaintiff was warned that failure to file the IPFF would "result in case dismissal without prejudice and without further notice." (ECF No. 3.) The IPFF has not been received, and it is ultimately Plaintiffs responsibility to ensure that it is received by the Court. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff has thirty days in which to SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for failure to pay the IPFF.No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 11/17/2023. (kpf)
October 17, 2023 Filing 5 **SEALED DOCUMENT** FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff James Armond Mazzetti, III received from Correctional Institution. Initial Partial Filing Fee $ 15.50. (kpf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2023: #1 FFF Initial Payment statement) (kpf). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2023: #2 Inmate Statement) (kpf).
October 12, 2023 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Nick Daniels, Cameron Dexter, FNU Hardy, Matthew Lambert, Randy Patton, Robert Powell (Originally received by the court on 10/11/2023). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by James Armond Mazzetti, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (haa)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Based on the inmate's attached Required Authorization, Consent, and Declaration, the inmate account office is authorized and requested to: 1) within 14 days file the Financial Certificate showing the Initial Partial Filing Fee together with the inmate account statement as outlined in the attached instructions, and 2) remit the initial partial filing fee within 30 days as outlined in the attached instructions. Failure to comply will result in case dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. (Documents have been mailed to the Financial Department of the Institution.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/12/2023. No attached document. (kpf)
October 11, 2023 Filing 2 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, civil cover sheet and envelope. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope )(haa)
October 11, 2023 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 10/11/2023) filed by Plaintiff James Armond Mazzetti, III. (haa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mazzetti v. Powell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Armond Mazzetti, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Dexter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?