Lake Town Towing et al v. State of Utah et al
Plaintiff: Lake Town Towing, J&K 24 Hour Diesel Service, Joe Flynn and Sam Probert
Defendant: State of Utah, Jess Anderson, Millard County, Richard Jacobson, Greg Kelsey, Jeff Rowell, Trevor Atkin, Jared Higgs and Trevor Atkins
Case Number: 2:2023cv00818
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #17 filed by Plaintiffs Joe Flynn, J&K 24 Hour Diesel Service, Lake Town Towing, Sam Probert (Sorensen, Christopher)
December 22, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #17 filed by Plaintiffs Joe Flynn, J&K 24 Hour Diesel Service, Lake Town Towing, Sam Probert (Isom, Christina)
December 22, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #17 filed by Defendants Richard Jacobson, Millard County (Macanas, Janise)
December 22, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #17 filed by Defendants Richard Jacobson, Millard County (Hamilton, R.)
December 21, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #17 filed by Plaintiffs Joe Flynn, J&K 24 Hour Diesel Service, Lake Town Towing, Sam Probert (Sykes, Robert)
December 21, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #17 filed by Defendants Jess Anderson, Trevor Atkins, Jared Higgs, Greg Kelsey, Jeff Rowell, State of Utah (Chesnut, Heather)
December 21, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #17 filed by Defendants Jess Anderson, Trevor Atkins, Jared Higgs, Greg Kelsey, Jeff Rowell, State of Utah (Strand, Peter)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 12/18/2023. (lwh)
December 5, 2023 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by State of Utah as to State of Utah Waiver sent on 12/4/2023, answer due 2/2/2024. (Strand, Peter)
December 5, 2023 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jeff Rowell as to Jeff Rowell Waiver sent on 12/4/2023, answer due 2/2/2024. (Strand, Peter)
December 5, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Greg Kelsey as to Greg Kelsey Waiver sent on 12/4/2023, answer due 2/2/2024. (Strand, Peter)
December 5, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jared Higgs as to Jared Higgs Waiver sent on 12/4/2023, answer due 2/2/2024. (Strand, Peter)
December 5, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Trevor Atkins as to Trevor Atkins Waiver sent on 12/4/2023, answer due 2/2/2024. (Strand, Peter)
December 5, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jess Anderson as to Jess Anderson Waiver sent on 12/4/2023, answer due 2/2/2024. (Strand, Peter)
December 5, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Janise Kekauoha Macanas on behalf of Richard Jacobson, Millard County (Macanas, Janise)
December 5, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Blake Hamilton on behalf of Richard Jacobson, Millard County (Hamilton, R.)
December 4, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Millard County, Richard Jacobson as to Millard County Waiver sent on 12/4/2023, answer due 2/2/2024; Richard Jacobson Waiver sent on 12/4/2023, answer due 2/2/2024. (Hamilton, R.)
December 4, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF NON-CONSENT Consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge under DUCivR 72-4 has not been obtained. Case randomly assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish and Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero is automatically referred under 28 U.S.C636(b)(1)(A). Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case. (mh)
November 9, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Jess Anderson, Trevor Atkins, Jared Higgs, Richard Jacobson, Greg Kelsey, Millard County, Jeff Rowell, State of Utah, Plaintiffs Joe Flynn, J&K 24 Hour Diesel Service, Lake Town Towing, Sam Probert. Form due by 11/30/2023. (mh)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 11/09/2023. (haa)
November 8, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jess Anderson, Trevor Atkin, Jared Higgs, Greg Kelsey, Jeff Rowell, State of Utah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Strand, Peter)
November 8, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Jess Anderson, Trevor Atkin, Jared Higgs, Richard Jacobson, Greg Kelsey, Millard County, Jeff Rowell, State of Utah, Plaintiffs Joe Flynn, J&K 24 Hour Diesel Service, Lake Town Towing, Sam Probert. (kec)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third Judicial District Court, Salt Lake County, case number 230908294, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4870183) filed by Greg Kelsey, Jess Anderson, State of Utah, Trevor Atkin, Jared Higgs, Jeff Rowell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Docket) (Strand, Peter)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Defendants Jess Anderson, Trevor Atkin, Jared Higgs, Richard Jacobson, Greg Kelsey, Millard County, Jeff Rowell, State of Utah is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and civil cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (kec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lake Town Towing et al v. State of Utah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake Town Towing
Represented By: Robert B. Sykes
Represented By: Christina Dawn Isom
Represented By: Christopher Peter Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&K 24 Hour Diesel Service
Represented By: Robert B. Sykes
Represented By: Christina Dawn Isom
Represented By: Christopher Peter Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Flynn
Represented By: Robert B. Sykes
Represented By: Christina Dawn Isom
Represented By: Christopher Peter Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Probert
Represented By: Christina Dawn Isom
Represented By: Christopher Peter Sorensen
Represented By: Robert B. Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Utah
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Represented By: Heather J. Chesnut
Represented By: Sean D. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jess Anderson
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Represented By: Heather J. Chesnut
Represented By: Sean D. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millard County
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Represented By: Heather J. Chesnut
Represented By: Sean D. Reyes
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Represented By: Janise Kekauoha Macanas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Jacobson
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Represented By: Heather J. Chesnut
Represented By: Sean D. Reyes
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Represented By: Janise Kekauoha Macanas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Kelsey
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Represented By: Heather J. Chesnut
Represented By: Sean D. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Rowell
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Represented By: Heather J. Chesnut
Represented By: Sean D. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Atkin
Represented By: Sean D. Reyes
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Represented By: Heather J. Chesnut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Higgs
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Represented By: Heather J. Chesnut
Represented By: Sean D. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Atkins
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Represented By: Heather J. Chesnut
Represented By: Sean D. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?