Alder Holdings LLC v. Gilles
Plaintiff: Alder Holdings LLC
Defendant: Edriss Gilles
Case Number: 2:2023cv00841
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: Within fourteen days, Plaintiff may supplement its #5 motion for alternative service with any additional evidence that Defendant's email address identified in the motion is valid and current. If no supplemental evidence is filed, the court will rule on the motion based on the previously-filed evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/8/2024. No attached document.(med)
January 5, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Service of Process. Summons to be served on: Edriss Gilles and Memorandum in Support (Alternative Service by Email, Text and Mail) filed by Plaintiff Alder Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Jason R. Hull), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hull, Jason)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/17/2023. (alf)
November 16, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Edriss Gilles. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
November 16, 2023 Filing 2 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (kec)
November 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Edriss Gilles (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4878039) filed by Alder Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hull, Jason)
November 16, 2023 Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg added. Case number will now read 2:23-cv-00841-DAO. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alder Holdings LLC v. Gilles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alder Holdings LLC
Represented By: Jason R. Hull
Represented By: Dominic William Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edriss Gilles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?