Arrow Legal Solutions Group et al v. Maughan et al
Plaintiff: Arrow Legal Solutions Group, Loren M Lambert, Cecilia Salazar, Aurelio Oxandaberat, Sagrario Diaz, Monica P Molina, Luis G Gamez, Dan Hernandez, Susan Watson and Steven Burt
Defendant: Jaceson R Maughan, Christopher C Hill, Aurora Holley, University of Utah, Rocky Mountains Center of Occupational and Environmental Health, Labor Commission of Utah, Todd Samuelson, Brian Christiansen, Melissa Cheng, Kurk T Hegmann and Jeremy Biggs
Case Number: 2:2023cv00868
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 22 Motions No Longer Referred: #21 MOTION to Bifurcate. District Judge will address. (kbm)
January 25, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION to Bifurcate the case filed by Plaintiff Arrow Legal Solutions Group. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Lambert, Loren)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Based on the parties' stipulation and good cause shown, Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the #2 Notice of Removal is extended to 4/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/12/2024. No attached document. (gdr)
January 11, 2024 Filing 19 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Notice of Removal, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Jeremy Biggs, Melissa Cheng, Brian Christiansen, Kurk T Hegmann, Christopher C Hill, Aurora Holley, Labor Commission of Utah, Jaceson R Maughan, Rocky Mountains Center of Occupational and Environmental Health, Todd Samuelson, University of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg. Attorney Peter J. Strand added to party Jeremy Biggs(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Strand added to party Melissa Cheng(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Strand added to party Brian Christiansen(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Strand added to party Kurk T Hegmann(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Strand added to party Christopher C Hill (pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Strand added to party Aurora Holley(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Strand added to party Labor Commission of Utah(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Strand added to party Rocky Mountains Center of Occupational and Environmental Health(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Strand added to party Todd Samuelson (pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Strand added to party University of Utah(pty:dft)(Strand, Peter)
December 8, 2023 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Todd Samuelson as to Todd Samuelson Waiver sent on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Strand, Peter)
December 8, 2023 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jaceson R Maughan as to Jaceson R Maughan Waiver sent on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Strand, Peter)
December 8, 2023 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Aurora Holley as to Aurora Holley Waiver sent on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Strand, Peter)
December 8, 2023 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christopher C Hill as to Christopher C Hill Waiver sent on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Strand, Peter)
December 8, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kurk T Hegmann as to Kurk T Hegmann Waiver sent on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Strand, Peter)
December 8, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Brian Christiansen as to Brian Christiansen Waiver sent on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Strand, Peter)
December 8, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Melissa Cheng as to Melissa Cheng Waiver sent on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Strand, Peter)
December 8, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jeremy Biggs as to Jeremy Biggs Waiver sent on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Strand, Peter)
December 8, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Rocky Mountains Center of Occupational and Environmental Health as to Rocky Mountains Center of Occupational and Environmental Health Waiver sent on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Gover, Thom)
December 8, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Labor Commission of Utah as to Labor Commission of Utah Waiver sent on 12/5/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Gover, Thom)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 12/05/2023. (haa)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 12/01/2023. (kpf)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all non-dispositive pretrial matters. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 12/01/2023. (cfm)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Labor Commission of Utah, Jaceson R Maughan re #2 Notice of Removal, (Strand, Peter)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Arrow Legal Solutions Group, Steven Burt, Sagrario Diaz, Luis G Gamez, Dan Hernandez, Loren M Lambert, Monica P Molina, Aurelio Oxandaberat, Cecilia Salazar, Susan Watson, Defendants Jeremy Biggs, Melissa Cheng, Brian Christiansen, Kurk T Hegmann, Christopher C Hill, Aurora Holley, Labor Commission of Utah, Jaceson R Maughan, Rocky Mountains Center of Occupational and Environmental Health, Todd Samuelson, University of Utah. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 12/21/2023. (kec)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs: Arrow Legal Solutions Group, Steven Burt, Sagrario Diaz, Luis G Gamez, Dan Hernandez, Loren M Lambert, Monica P Molina, Aurelio Oxandaberat, Cecilia Salazar, and Susan Watson. As well as Defendant Jaceson R Maughan. (kec)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District, Salt Lake County, case number 230903797, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4892440) filed by Jaceson R Maughan, Labor Commission of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Motion to Amend, #5 Exhibit E. Motion for Ext of Service, #6 Exhibit F - State Docket) (Strand, Peter) Modified on 12/4/2023 (haa).
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Barlow. Defendant Jaceson R Maughan is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (sg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrow Legal Solutions Group et al v. Maughan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arrow Legal Solutions Group
Represented By: Loren M. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren M Lambert
Represented By: Loren M. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Salazar
Represented By: Loren M. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurelio Oxandaberat
Represented By: Loren M. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sagrario Diaz
Represented By: Loren M. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica P Molina
Represented By: Loren M. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis G Gamez
Represented By: Loren M. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Hernandez
Represented By: Loren M. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Watson
Represented By: Loren M. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Burt
Represented By: Loren M. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaceson R Maughan
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Represented By: Thom M. Gover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher C Hill
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Holley
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Utah
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Mountains Center of Occupational and Environmental Health
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Labor Commission of Utah
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Samuelson
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Christiansen
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Cheng
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurk T Hegmann
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Biggs
Represented By: Peter J. Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?