Paciorek v. The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Plaintiff: Kenneth Michael Paciorek
Defendant: The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Case Number: 2:2023cv00904
Filed: December 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULING & ORDER: Plaintiff is to file an amended complaint by February 26, 2024, that complies with the rules and standards as set forth above. The words "Amended Complaint" must appear in the caption of the document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 2/2/24. (dle)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge David Barlow recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 01/05/2024. (kpf)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF NON-CONSENT Consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge under DUCivR 72-4 has not been obtained. Case randomly assigned to Judge David Barlow and Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead is automatically referred under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B). Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case. (mh)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Kenneth Michael Paciorek. (mh)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Transferring Case. The court ORDERS that Case No. 2:23-cv-906 JCB Paciorek v. Utah County Jail et al. be transferred to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/29/2023. (jwt)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints (Originally received by the court on 12/15/2023). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Kenneth Michael Paciorek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (haa)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court will screen the complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) and Local Civil Rule DUCivR 3-2 (b). Plaintiff may complete and return forms provided by the court. The Clerks Office is directed to provide Plaintiff with the email filing and electronic notification form for unrepresented parties. Other than court forms, Plaintiff must not file any motions or other documents during the time the case is screened or until the court orders otherwise. If such documents are filed, they will be lodged on the docket and will not be addressed until screening is complete. The time to serve the complaint is tolled until further order of the court. If the action is allowed to proceed, the court will order service of process on the defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/18/2023. (haa)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Kenneth Michael Paciorek. Form due by 1/5/2024. (mh)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet )(haa)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 12/15/2023) filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Michael Paciorek. (haa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paciorek v. The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Michael Paciorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?