Avantgarde Group S.P.A. v. Stock Loan Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Avantgarde Group S.P.A. and 1AF2
Defendant: Harvey L. Carmichael, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Joe D. Thomas, Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carnicle, Sanskirt LLC, Harvey Carmichael, Inc. and Stock Loan Solutions
Case Number: 2:2024cv00137
Filed: February 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE OF PRESIDING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs 1AF2, Avantgarde Group S.P.A., Defendants Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael, Harvey Carmichael, Inc., Sanskirt LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Joe D. Thomas. Form due by 5/7/2024. (mh)
April 15, 2024 Filing 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed served on Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Joe D. Thomas, Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael, Sanskirt LLC, Harvey Carmichael, Inc. Stock Loan Solutions, LLC on 04/15/2024. Acknowledgment filed by Sanskirt LLC, Joe D. Thomas, Harvey Carmichael, Inc., Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael. (Reutzel, Jeremy)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Timothy Scott Vick for 1AF2 and Avantgarde Group S.P.A..Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/11/2024. (alf)
March 11, 2024 Filing 22 Summons Issued Electronically as to Stock Loan Solutions, LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
March 11, 2024 Filing 21 Summons Issued Electronically as to Stock Loan Solutions. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
March 11, 2024 Filing 20 Summons Issued Electronically as to Sanskirt LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
March 11, 2024 Filing 19 Summons Issued Electronically as to Joe D. Thomas. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
March 11, 2024 Filing 18 Summons Issued Electronically as to Harvey L. Carmichael. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
March 11, 2024 Filing 17 Summons Issued Electronically as to Harvey Carmichael, Inc.. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
March 11, 2024 Filing 16 Summons Issued Electronically as to Camo, LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
March 8, 2024 Filing 15 Requested Summons as to Stock Loan Solutions, LLC. (Williams, David)
March 8, 2024 Filing 14 Requested Summons as to Stock Loan Solutions. (Williams, David)
March 8, 2024 Filing 13 Requested Summons as to Sanskirt LLC. (Williams, David)
March 8, 2024 Filing 12 Requested Summons as to Joe D. Thomas. (Williams, David)
March 8, 2024 Filing 11 Requested Summons as to Harvey L. Carmichael. (Williams, David)
March 8, 2024 Filing 10 Requested Summons as to Harvey Carmichael, Inc.. (Williams, David)
March 8, 2024 Filing 9 Requested Summons as to Camo, LLC. (Williams, David)
March 8, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of T. Scott Vick , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4994376,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiffs 1AF2, Avantgarde Group S.P.A.. (Williams, David)
February 27, 2024 Filing 7 REFUND REQUEST FOR DUPLICATE FEE PAYMENT filed by Williams, David.Authorized refunds for credit card or debit card payments will be processed through Pay.gov. Authorized refunds of ACH payments will be issued by check through the U.S. Treasury. A waiting period of up to 30 days may be required before your request is approved. If you have not received your refund after 40 days, please contact the clerk's office and ask to speak someone in the finance department. (Williams, David)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 2/26/2024. (alf)
February 23, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance Pro Hac Vice mailed to attorney Scott Vick for 1AF2, Avantgarde Group S.P.A. (sg)
February 23, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INELIGIBLE ATTORNEY -Attorney Ron Vance, for Plaintiffs 1AF2, Avantgarde Group S.P.A., has been notified that he/she is not in active status or has not been admitted to practice in this court and can not practice before this court. (sg)
February 23, 2024 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael, Harvey Carmichael, Inc., Sanskirt LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Joe D. Thomas with filing fee previously paid (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-4978634) filed by Avantgarde Group S.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, David) Modified on 2/23/2024 (sg). Text stricken, to add receipt number.
February 23, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #1 Complaint. The Civil Cover Sheet is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule DUCivR3-4. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet JS44 immediately. (sg)
February 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-4978634) filed by Avantgarde Group S.P.A.. (Williams, David)
February 23, 2024 Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg added. Case number will now read 2:24-cv-00137-DAO. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avantgarde Group S.P.A. v. Stock Loan Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey L. Carmichael
Represented By: Jeremy C. Reutzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stock Loan Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy C. Reutzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe D. Thomas
Represented By: Jeremy C. Reutzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camo, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy C. Reutzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey L. Carnicle
Represented By: Jeremy C. Reutzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanskirt LLC
Represented By: Jeremy C. Reutzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Carmichael, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy C. Reutzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stock Loan Solutions
Represented By: Jeremy C. Reutzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avantgarde Group S.P.A.
Represented By: David R. Williams
Represented By: Timothy Scott Vick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1AF2
Represented By: David R. Williams
Represented By: Timothy Scott Vick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?