Ajayi v. Mortensen et al
Plaintiff: Ayoola Ajayi
Defendant: Brian Redd, FNU Powell, Michelle Hofmann and Bart Mortensen
Unknown: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2024cv00366
Filed: May 22, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Ayoola Ajayi. (kpf)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant(s) Mortensen, Hoffman, Redd and Powell filed by Plaintiff Ayoola Ajayi. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
July 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EXHIBITS filed by Ayoola Ajayi re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope )(kpf)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Correspondence from Ayoola Ajayi. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kpf)
June 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Correspondence from Plaintiff Ayoola Ajayi. (eat)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Ayoola Ajayi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(sg)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michelle Hofmann, Bart Mortensen, FNU Powell, Brian Redd (Filing fee $ 405.00, receipt number 6085) filed by Ayoola Ajayi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (sg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ajayi v. Mortensen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bart Mortensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayoola Ajayi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?