Monson v. O'Malley
Plaintiff: Gary Warren Monson
Defendant: Martin J. O'Malley
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2024cv00542
Filed: July 31, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD ANSWER. The Commissioner's answer to #1 Complaint is received filed by Martin J. O'Malley. Under Supplemental Rule 6, Plaintiff Motion for Review of Agency Action must be filed and served by 10/25/2024. Under Supplemental Rule 7, Commissioner response brief must be filed and served on the plaintiff within 30 days after service of the Motion for Review of Agency Action. Under Supplemental Rule 8, Plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Commissioner brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Court Transcript Index, #2 Exhibit 3 - Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #3 Exhibit 4 - Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 Exhibit 5 - Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 Exhibit 6 - Non Disability Related Development, #6 Exhibit 7 - Disability Related Development, #7 Exhibit Medical Records (Volume 1), #8 Exhibit Medical Records (Volumes 2 through 3), #9 Exhibit Medical Records (Volumes 4 through 8))(Berndt, Amanda)
August 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda A. Berndt on behalf of Martin J. O'Malley (Berndt, Amanda)
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE - Service in Social Security Case, re #1 Complaint filed. Consistent with the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and DUCivR 7-4, the court has notified the Commissioner of the commencement of this action by transmitting a Notice of Electronic Filing to the Social Security Administration and United States Attorney's Office for the District of Utah. Answer due by 10/1/2024. (kec)
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/1/2024. (kec)
August 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONSENT Under DUCivR 72-4, returned Consent Forms from all relevant parties are now filed. The Magistrate Judge is presiding by consent. (mh)
August 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Gary Warren Monson. (mh)
July 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF PRESIDING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Gary Warren Monson. Form due by 8/21/2024. (mh)
July 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 07/31/2024) filed by Plaintiff Gary Warren Monson. (sg)
July 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martin J. O'Malley (Originally received by the court on 07/31/2024). (Fee Status: Pending IFP) filed by Gary Warren Monson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (sg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monson v. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Warren Monson
Represented By: John J. Borsos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J. O'Malley
Represented By: Amanda A. Berndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?