Colucci v. Rose et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Colucci
Defendant: Justin Rose, Simon Fuller, Joseph Bean, Jesse LNU and Karen Malm
Unknown: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2025cv00041
Filed: January 17, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepaying the Filing Fee. Based on the inmate's attached Required Authorization, Consent, and Declaration, the inmate account office is authorized and requested to: 1) within 14 days file the Financial Certificate showing the Initial Partial Filing Fee together with the inmate account statement as outlined in the attached instructions, and 2) remit the initial partial filing fee within 30 days as outlined in the attached instructions. It is ultimately Plaintiffs responsibility to ensure these items are received from the inmate account office. Failure to comply will result in case dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 02/26/2025. (kpf)
February 24, 2025 Filing 5 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Joseph Colucci. (kpf)
February 18, 2025 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Joseph Colucci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (eat)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepaying the Filing Fee. Still, the Motion is incomplete or not compliant with the court's requirements. The Motion is therefore only conditionally granted. The Plaintiff should carefully review the attached standard Notice of Deficiency and must complete and return the attached motion form. If the required inmate account statement has not already been filed it must be filed within 30 days. If the correctly completed motion and account statement are not received within 30 days the case will be dismissed without prejudice without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 01/22/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 01/22/2025.(Attachments: #1 Notice of Deficiency, #2 Motion for IFP Form)(kpf)
January 16, 2025 Filing 2 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 01/16/2025) filed by Plaintiff Joseph Colucci. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(sg)
January 16, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph Bean, Simon Fuller, Jesse LNU, Karen Malm, Justin Rose (Originally received by the court on 01/16/2025). (Fee Status: PENDING IFP) filed by Joseph Colucci. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (sg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colucci v. Rose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Colucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Malm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?