L. et al v. United Healthcare Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Anne L. and S. L.
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Behavioral Health and Starling Physicians P.C.
Case Number: 2:2025cv00127
Filed: February 20, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF INELIGIBLE ATTORNEY -Attorney Michael E. Holzapfel, for Defendant Starling Physicians P.C., has been notified that they are not in active status or has not been admitted to practice in this court and can not practice before this court. (mh)
April 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Anne L., S. L.. Waiver received from Attorney Holzapfel, Michael E. on 4/14/2025. (King, Brian)
April 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Anne L., S. L.. Waiver received from Maryann Bauhs ESQ on 4/11/2025. (King, Brian)
April 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Anne L., S. L.. Waiver received from Maryann Bauhs ESQ on 4/11/2025. (King, Brian)
March 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #6 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Memorandum Decision, filed by Plaintiffs Anne L., S. L.NOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (King, Brian)
March 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Plaintiffs Anne L. and S. L.. (mh)
March 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 03/04/2025. (sg)
March 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order: Granting #5 Motion to proceed anonymously. On or before March 18, 2025, Plaintiffs must file under seal with the court a document containing Anne L.s full name and S.L.s full name. That filing shall remain under seal unless the court orders otherwise. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 03/04/2025. (kpf)
March 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION To Proceed Anonymously re 4 Order,,, filed by Plaintiffs Anne L., S. L.. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(King, Brian)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET TEXT ORDER Plaintiffs filed this case using their initials. Rule 10(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure requires a complaint to name all the parties. See also Fed. R. Civ. P. 17(a) (requiring an action to "be prosecuted in the name of the real party in interest"). "Absent permission by the district court to proceed anonymously, and under such other conditions as the court may impose (such as requiring disclosure of their true identity under seal), the federal courts lack jurisdiction over the unnamed parties." Nat'l Commodity & Barter Ass'n, Nat'l Commodity Exch. v. Gibbs, 886 F.2d 1240, 1245 (10th Cir. 1989). Therefore, within fourteen days, Plaintiffs must either file an amended complaint under their full names or file a motion for leave to proceed under initials. If Plaintiffs do not comply, the court may dismiss this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/24/2025. (cg)
February 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/21/2025. (gb)
February 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-3, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Anne L., S. L.. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 3/14/2025. (kec)
February 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Judge Ted Stewart added. Case number will now read 2:25-cv-00127-TS. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5339135) filed by Anne L., S. L.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (King, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L. et al v. United Healthcare Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne L.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Samuel Martin Hall
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Andrew James Somers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. L.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Samuel Martin Hall
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Andrew James Somers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Maryann Bauhs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health
Represented By: Maryann Bauhs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starling Physicians P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?