TDJ Inc v. Department of the Treasury, Alcohol and Tobacco Tax and Trade Bureau

Plaintiff: TDJ Inc
Defendant: Department of the Treasury, Alcohol and Tobacco Tax and Trade Bureau
Interested Party: Zion's Bank
Case Number: 4:2018cv00056
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Civil Case Terminated per #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to case (alt)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff TDJ Inc (Barnett, James)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 6 Order to Show Cause,, filed by TDJ Inc. (Barnett, James)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Plaintiff is directed to respond in writing within 7 days from the date of this order and inform the Court why it has standing under 26 U.S.C. 7426(a)(1) to contest the levy at issue here. 26 U.S.C. 7426(a)(1) specifies that "the person against whom is assessed the tax out of which such levy arose" may not assert a civil claim of wrongful levy against the United States. Plaintiff must articulate why, as a taxpayer against whom tax has been assessed and a levy entered, it has standing. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 08/30/18. (akj)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/30/18 (alt)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 8/30/18 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (asb)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Department of the Treasury, Alcohol and Tobacco Tax and Trade Bureau (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3092058) filed by TDJ Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Barnett, James)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff TDJ Inc is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jwt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TDJ Inc v. Department of the Treasury, Alcohol and Tobacco Tax and Trade Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TDJ Inc
Represented By: James L. Barnett
Represented By: Steven P. Young
Represented By: Nathan R. Runyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Zion's Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury, Alcohol and Tobacco Tax and Trade Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?