Conboy v. Gilbert Development

Plaintiff: Michael W. Conboy
Defendant: Gilbert Development
Case Number: 4:2018cv00090
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/10/19 (alt)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint filed by Defendant Gilbert Development. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Attorney R. Blake Hamilton added to party Gilbert Development(pty:dft)(Hamilton, R.)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael W. Conboy as to Gilbert Development served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Rothschild, Brian)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Gilbert Development. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Ordered at direction of Judge David Nuffer on 12/3/18. (dla)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 Modification of Docket: Error: Complaint was filed against the plaintiff rather than defendant. Correction: Docket text has been modified to reflect complaint is filed against defendant rather than plaintiff; answer records corrected re #2 Complaint. (nl)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 12/3/18. (dla)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (asb)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Defendant (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3156656) filed by Michael W. Conboy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet for Complaint) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Rothschild, Brian) Modified on 12/3/2018 to correct complaint filed against defendant. (nl).
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff Michael W. Conboy is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conboy v. Gilbert Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Development
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Conboy
Represented By: John L. Cooper
Represented By: Brian M. Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?