Nasserziayee et al v. Ruggles et al

Plaintiff: Farooq Nasserziayee and Lenore Supnet
Defendant: FNU Ruggles, Jack Ruggles, Jacobs Ranch and Zion Canyon Trail Rides at Jacobs Ranch
Case Number: 4:2019cv00022
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 REASSIGNMENT to Newly Appointed Magistrate Judge. Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. Case number will now read 4:19-cv-00022-DN-PK. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (rks)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Zion Canyon Trail Rides at Jacobs Ranch. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to FNU Ruggles. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jack Ruggles. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/5/19 (alt)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 3/5/19 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (asb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorneys Timothy L. Moulton and Kathleen M. Kassmann, for Plaintiffs Farooq Nasserziayee and Lenore Supnet. (tlh)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3217611) filed by Farooq Nasserziayee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (McKay, Chad)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiffs Farooq Nasserziayee and Lenore Supnet are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nasserziayee et al v. Ruggles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Ruggles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Ruggles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobs Ranch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zion Canyon Trail Rides at Jacobs Ranch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farooq Nasserziayee
Represented By: Chad B. McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenore Supnet
Represented By: Chad B. McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?