Living Rivers et al v. Bernhardt et al

Plaintiff: Grand Canyon Trust, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Living Rivers, Sierra Club, Natural Resources Defense Council, Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper and Waterkeeper Alliance
Defendant: US Department of the Interior, David Bernhardt, US Bureau of Land Management, Larry Crist, Joseph Balash and US Fish & Wildlife Service
Petitioner: Enefit American Oil
Case Number: 4:2019cv00041
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Vacate #23 Order to Propose Schedule, filed by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper, Grand Canyon Trust, Living Rivers, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Waterkeeper Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Heidi) Modified on 7/11/2019: removed incorrectly added text (alt)
June 26, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support filed by Movant Enefit American Oil. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Declaration ISO Motion, #3 Supplement Copy of Complaint) Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Banks, Martin)
June 6, 2019 Filing 32 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Waterkeeper Alliance, Grand Canyon Trust, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Living Rivers, Colorado Riverkeeper, Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - John W. Huber)(McIntosh, Heidi)
June 6, 2019 Filing 31 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Waterkeeper Alliance, Grand Canyon Trust, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Living Rivers, Colorado Riverkeeper, Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - William Barr)(McIntosh, Heidi)
June 6, 2019 Filing 30 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Waterkeeper Alliance, Grand Canyon Trust, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Living Rivers, Colorado Riverkeeper, Center for Biological Diversity. US Fish & Wildlife Service served on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McIntosh, Heidi)
June 6, 2019 Filing 29 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Waterkeeper Alliance, Grand Canyon Trust, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Living Rivers, Colorado Riverkeeper, Center for Biological Diversity. US Department of the Interior served on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McIntosh, Heidi)
June 6, 2019 Filing 28 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Waterkeeper Alliance, Grand Canyon Trust, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Living Rivers, Colorado Riverkeeper, Center for Biological Diversity. Larry Crist served on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McIntosh, Heidi)
June 6, 2019 Filing 27 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Waterkeeper Alliance, Grand Canyon Trust, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Living Rivers, Colorado Riverkeeper, Center for Biological Diversity. US Bureau of Land Management served on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McIntosh, Heidi)
June 6, 2019 Filing 26 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Waterkeeper Alliance, Grand Canyon Trust, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Living Rivers, Colorado Riverkeeper, Center for Biological Diversity. David Bernhardt served on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McIntosh, Heidi)
June 6, 2019 Filing 25 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Waterkeeper Alliance, Grand Canyon Trust, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Living Rivers, Colorado Riverkeeper, Center for Biological Diversity. Joseph Balash served on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McIntosh, Heidi)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/23/2019. (asb)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/17/19 (alt)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Toll for Center for Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper, Grand Canyon Trust, Living Rivers, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Waterkeeper Alliance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 5/17/19 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edward B. Zukoski for Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper, Grand Canyon Trus, Living Rivers, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Waterkeeper Alliance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 5/17/19 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Hiatt; granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alex Hardee: both for Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper, Grand Canyon Trus, Living Rivers, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Waterkeeper Alliance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 5/17/19 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
May 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (asb)
May 16, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Toll , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3277058, filed by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper, Grand Canyon Trust, Living Rivers, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Waterkeeper Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Heidi)
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edward B. Zukoski , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3277049, filed by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper, Grand Canyon Trust, Living Rivers, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Waterkeeper Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Heidi)
May 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alex Hardee , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3277045, filed by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper, Grand Canyon Trust, Living Rivers, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Waterkeeper Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Heidi)
May 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Hiatt , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3277029, filed by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper, Grand Canyon Trust, Living Rivers, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Waterkeeper Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Heidi)
May 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Edward B. Zukoski, for Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. (nl)
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Michael Toll, for Plaintiff Grand Canyon Trust. (nl)
May 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Michael Hiatt and Alex Hardee, for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper, Grand Canyon Trust, Living Rivers, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Waterkeeper Alliance. (nl)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Attorney General. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Attorney District of Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to US Fish & Wildlife Service. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to US Bureau of Land Management. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Larry Crist. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to US Department of the Interior. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to David Bernhardt. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Joseph Balash. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper, Grand Canyon Trust, Living Rivers, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Waterkeeper Alliance (McIntosh, Heidi)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3276874) filed by Waterkeeper Alliance, Grand Canyon Trust, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Living Rivers, Colorado Riverkeeper, Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (McIntosh, Heidi)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Colorado Riverkeeper, Grand Canyon Trust, Living Rivers, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment, Waterkeeper Alliance is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Living Rivers et al v. Bernhardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grand Canyon Trust
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Michael S. Toll
Represented By: Alex Hardee
Represented By: Edward B. Zukoski
Represented By: Michael Hiatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Michael S. Toll
Represented By: Alex Hardee
Represented By: Edward B. Zukoski
Represented By: Michael Hiatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Living Rivers
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Michael S. Toll
Represented By: Alex Hardee
Represented By: Edward B. Zukoski
Represented By: Michael Hiatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Michael S. Toll
Represented By: Alex Hardee
Represented By: Edward B. Zukoski
Represented By: Michael Hiatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Michael S. Toll
Represented By: Alex Hardee
Represented By: Edward B. Zukoski
Represented By: Michael Hiatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Michael S. Toll
Represented By: Alex Hardee
Represented By: Edward B. Zukoski
Represented By: Michael Hiatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Riverkeeper
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Michael S. Toll
Represented By: Alex Hardee
Represented By: Edward B. Zukoski
Represented By: Michael Hiatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterkeeper Alliance
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Michael S. Toll
Represented By: Alex Hardee
Represented By: Edward B. Zukoski
Represented By: Michael Hiatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Crist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Balash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Fish & Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Enefit American Oil
Represented By: Martin K. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?