Rasmussen v. Saul

Plaintiff: Darin Rasmussen
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Andrew M. Saul
Not Yet Classified: SSA Notice
Case Number: 4:2019cv00044
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: Andrew Saul became the Commissioner of Social Security on June 17, 2019. Pursuant to Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the last sentence of section 205(g) of the Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. 405(g), Andrew Saul is substituted for Nancy A. Berryhill as the defendant in this suit. (jds)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to US Attorneys Office Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Attorney General of the United States. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Nancy A. Berryhill. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill filed by Darin Rasmussen. (Originally received by the court on 05/28/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) (Electronic document provided on disc.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler (tlh)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 05/30/2019. (tlh)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 5/28/2019) filed by Plaintiff Darin Rasmussen. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasmussen v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SSA Notice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin Rasmussen
Represented By: Natalie L. Bolli-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?