Bringhurst v. Wright Medical Technology et al
Plaintiff: Gary Bringhurst
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology and Wright Medical Group
Case Number: 4:2019cv00050
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Bringhurst (Leemon, Thomas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gary Bringhurst (Leemon, Thomas)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of George E. McLaughlin for Gary Bringhurst. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 7/2/19 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas R. Leemon for Gary Bringhurst. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 7/2/19 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of George E. McLaughlin , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3314843, filed by Plaintiff Gary Bringhurst. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Application for Pro Hac Vice and ECF Registration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Douglas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas R. Leemon , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3314794, filed by Plaintiff Gary Bringhurst. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Application for Pro Hac Vice and ECF Registration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Douglas)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PREPARE SCHEDULE AND PREPARE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 6/24/2019. (jds)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Thomas R. Leemon and George E. McLaughlin, for Plaintiff Gary Bringhurst. (tlh)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 6/24/2019. (asb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (asb)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3307117) filed by Gary Bringhurst. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Document 1) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Cannon, Douglas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff Gary Bringhurst is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bringhurst v. Wright Medical Technology et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Bringhurst
Represented By: Douglas B. Cannon
Represented By: Thomas R. Leemon
Represented By: George E. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?