Winn et al v. Cunningham
Plaintiff: Stephen Bruce Winn and Susan Winn
Defendant: Gregory E. Cunningham
Case Number: 4:2019cv00054
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/30/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 1/30/2020. Expert Discovery due by 8/20/2020. Dispositive or Potentially Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2021 at 10:00 AM in Room 2B (St George) before Judge David Nuffer. 5-Day Jury Trial set for 2/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Room 2B (St George) before Judge David Nuffer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 9/16/19. (dla)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF FILING of Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs Stephen Bruce Winn, Susan Winn. (Adamson, R.)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Adamson, R.)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #11 Motion for Leave to Appear By Telephone at 10/3/19 conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 9/11/19 (alt)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear By Telephone and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Stephen Bruce Winn, Susan Winn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Adamson, R.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING: Case Management & Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, 10/3/2019 at 11:00 AM in Room 2B (St George) before Judge David Nuffer. The Attorney Planning Meeting Report must be filed and the Proposed Scheduling Order must be emailed in word processing format to dj.nuffer@utd.uscourts.gov at least one week before the Conference.Court Address: 206 West Tabernacle, St George, Utah (asb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Notice of Allocation of Fault filed by Gregory E. Cunningham. Attorney Todd A. Turnblom added to party Gregory E. Cunningham(pty:dft)(Turnblom, Todd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James W. King for Stephen Bruce Winn, Susan Winn. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Ordered at direction of Judge David Nuffer on 8/6/19. No attached document. (dla)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James W. King , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3341214, filed by Plaintiffs Stephen Bruce Winn, Susan Winn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adamson, R.)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 7/31/2019. (asb)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 7/30/19 (alt)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (asb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Gregory E. Cunningham. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Gregory E. Cunningham (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3335141) filed by Stephen Bruce Winn, Susan Winn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Adamson, R.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiffs Stephen Bruce Winn and Susan Winn are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winn et al v. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Bruce Winn
Represented By: R. Jeremy Adamson
Represented By: James W. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Winn
Represented By: R. Jeremy Adamson
Represented By: James W. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory E. Cunningham
Represented By: Todd A. Turnblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?