Eagar v. Drake et al
Plaintiff: Michael Paul Eagar
Defendant: James Crisp, Alan Gardner, James Eardley and Dennis Drake
Case Number: 4:2019cv00061
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Michael Paul Eagar (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Envelope)(alt)
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Correspondence from Michael Paul Eagar. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (jlh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Plaintiff Michael Paul Eagar (alt)
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant James Crisp. (Mangum, John) Modified on 9/13/2019 (alt).
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of OBJECTION filed by Michael Paul Eagar. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (jlh)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 OBJECTIONS filed by Michael Paul Eagar (alt)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time Preparing Schedule and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant James Crisp. Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Mangum, John)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Dennis Drake, James Eardley, Alan Gardner. (Kunz, Barton)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to Prepare Schedule and Prepare for Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/16/19. (dla)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint: Defendant James Crisp may have through and including Friday, September 13, 2019, in which to file his response to the complaint in this action. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/16/19. (dla)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/16/2019. (asb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (asb)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Dennis Drake, James Eardley, Alan Gardner (Originally filed in 5th District Court on 8/15/2019). (jwt)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 File Received from 5th District Court, Washington County consisting of Complaint, Affidavits of Service, Notices of Filing Notice of Removal, Notice of Appearance and Motion to Dismiss as to County Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Affidavit of Service - James Crisp, #3 Affidavit of Service - Dennis Drake, #4 Affidavit of Service - James Eardley, #5 Affidavit of Service - Alan Gardner, #6 Copy of Notice of Removal Filed in Federal Court, #7 Notice to State COurt of Filed Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court, #8 Notice of Appearance of Counsel for County Defendants, #9 County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #10 Return of Electronic Notification) (jwt)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant James Crisp, Plaintiff Michael Paul Eagar. (tlh)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Notice of Removal, and Memorandum in Support re 2-1 Complaint filed by Defendant James Crisp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order na)(Mangum, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 5th District Court Washington County, case number 190500340, No Filing Fee No Filing Fee filed by James Crisp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet na) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Mangum, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Defendant James Crisp is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (USA)NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eagar v. Drake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Paul Eagar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Crisp
Represented By: John K. Mangum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Gardner
Represented By: Barton H. Kunz, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Eardley
Represented By: Barton H. Kunz, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Drake
Represented By: Barton H. Kunz, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?