Peterson v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Ken Peterson
Defendant: Richard Williams, Dixie State University, Lynn Joseph, Michael Lacourse and Daojo Hicks
Case Number: 4:2019cv00062
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Dixie State University. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Lynn Joseph. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael Lacourse. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Daojo Hicks. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Richard Williams. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/20/2019. (asb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Modification of Docket: Error: Complaint was filed twice. Correction: Entry was modified to reflect it should be disregarded. Answer records deleted. re #5 Complaint. (rks)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY ERROR - Disregard, duplicate of entry #3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 26JJKD7M) filed by Ken Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Rencher, Jaryl) Modified by adding error text and striking text on 8/19/2019 (rks).
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Modification of Docket: Error: Complaint was filed against Plaintiff instead of Defendants. Correction: Docket text has been modified to reflect complaint is filed against defendants rather than plaintiff; answer records corrected re #3 Complaint.Error: Complaint was emailed to the court on 8/16/2019 but was not E-filed until 8/19/2019 and the filing fee paid. Correction: Filing date was changed to 8/19/2019. (rks)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Richard Williams, Daojo Hicks, Michael Lacourse, Lynn Joseph, Dixie State University (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3351924) filed by Ken Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Rencher, Jaryl) Modified by correcting that the complaint was filed against defendants on 8/19/2019 (rks).
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to Prepare Schedule and Prepare for Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/19/19. (dla)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff Ken Peterson is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (rks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lacourse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daojo Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Peterson
Represented By: Benjamin K. Lusty
Represented By: Jaryl L. Rencher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?