Western Watersheds Project v. National Park Service et al
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Defendant: Susan L. Fritzke, Kate Hammond, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, National Park Service and Larry Crist
Case Number: 4:2019cv00065
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Neel Candrian on behalf of Larry Crist, Susan L. Fritzke, Kate Hammond, National Park Service, United States Fish and Wildlife Service (Candrian, Jeffrey)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DOCKET TEXT ORDER re #6 Order to Propose Schedule. The scheduling requirements of the #6 Order are vacated. Scheduling in this case is governed by DUCivR 7-4. The parties are directed to proceed with scheduling the case under DUCivR 7-4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 10/11/2019. No attached document. (apm)
September 23, 2019 Filing 26 ERRATA to #18 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project . (Persell, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 25 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney's Office. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 24 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Attorney General of the United States. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 23 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kate Hammond. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 22 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Susan L. Fritzke. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 21 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Larry Crist. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 20 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Fish and Wildlife Service. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 19 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to National Park Service. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Persell, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Fred Goodsell re #2 Complaint, filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Persell, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Persell, John)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/26/2019. (asb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kate Hammond. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to US Attorney's Office. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Attorney General of the United States. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Susan L. Fritzke. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Larry Crist. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Fish and Wildlife Service. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to National Park Service. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney John Persell, for Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project (tlh)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/23/19 (alt)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (asb)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Persell for Western Watersheds Project. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 8/23/19 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Persell , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3356649, filed by Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit application john persell, #2 Exhibit registration form)(Ban, Joel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT first against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3356631) filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Ratner, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Ban, Joel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Watersheds Project v. National Park Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan L. Fritzke
Represented By: Jeffrey Neel Candrian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Hammond
Represented By: Jeffrey Neel Candrian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Jeffrey Neel Candrian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Park Service
Represented By: Jeffrey Neel Candrian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Crist
Represented By: Jeffrey Neel Candrian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: John S. Persell
Represented By: Joel M. Ban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?