Morris et al v. Encore Medical et al
Plaintiff: Suzanne C. Morris and Joseph B. Morris
Defendant: DJO Global, Encore Medical, DJO LLC and DJO Surgical
Case Number: 4:2019cv00069
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction by Suzanne C. Morris and Joseph B. Morris (Dunn, Susan)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: by no later than 9/18/19, Plaintiffs must file notice clarifying diversity jurisdiction basis. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 9/5/19 (alt)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Prepare Schedule and Prepare for Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 8/23/19. (dla)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 9/3/2019. (asb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Modification of Docket: Error: Complaint was filed for Plaintiff Suzanne C. Morris only. Correction: Plaintiff Joseph B. Morris was added as a filer and the docket text was corrected. re #2 Complaint,. (tlh)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (asb)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3362993) filed by Suzanne C. Morris and Joseph B. Morris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Morris et al v Encore Medical ) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Dunn, Susan) Modified on 9/3/2019 by adding Joseph B. Morris as a filer and correcting the docket text (tlh).
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiffs Joseph B. Morris, Suzanne C. Morris is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris et al v. Encore Medical et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne C. Morris
Represented By: Susan Black Dunn
Represented By: Wayne Lewis Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph B. Morris
Represented By: Susan Black Dunn
Represented By: Wayne Lewis Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJO Global
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encore Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJO Surgical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?