Crane v. Utah Housing Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Heidi-Bianca Crane
Defendant: First Colony Mortgage, Utah Housing Corporation and Lincoln Title Insurance Agency
Case Number: 4:2019cv00081
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Lincoln Title Insurance Agency, Utah Housing Corporation. (Noel, Stephen)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Paul Kohler. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/12/2019. (asb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant First Colony Mortgage. Attorney Rodney W. Rivers added to party First Colony Mortgage(pty:dft)(Rivers, Rodney)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Lincoln Title Insurance Agency, Utah Housing Corporation. Attorney Stephen F. Noel added to party Lincoln Title Insurance Agency(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen F. Noel added to party Utah Housing Corporation(pty:dft)(Noel, Stephen)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Change Name Format on Document filed by Plaintiff Heidi-Bianca Crane (alt)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #11 Order to Show Cause, filed by Heidi-Bianca Crane (alt)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE denying #8 Motion for TRO; denying #8 Motion for Permanent Injunction; Plaintiff is to file a memorandum by 10/28/19 answering question re identifying a federal law applicable to her claim. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 10/23/19 (alt) Modified on 10/23/2019: corrected entry text (alt)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of incorrectly formatted notice of possible service on dfts, no indication of who accepted service for each. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (alt)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Expedite #8 Motion for TRO/Prelim Injunction, filed by Plaintiff Heidi-Bianca Crane (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (alt)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Heidi-Bianca Crane (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (alt)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Lincoln Title Insurance Agency. (nl)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to First Colony Mortgage. (nl)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Utah Housing Corporation. (nl)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 10/2/19 (alt)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against First Colony Mortgage, Lincoln Title Insurance Agency, Utah Housing Corporation (Originally received by the court on 09/30/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Heidi-Bianca Crane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A1, #4 Exhibit A2, #5 Exhibit A3, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit B1, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit C1, #10 Exhibit C2, #11 Exhibit C3, #12 Exhibit D, #13 Exhibit D1, #14 Exhibit D2, #15 Exhibit D3, #16 Exhibit E, #17 Civil Cover Sheet, #18 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (tlh)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 09/30/2019. (tlh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 9/30/2019) filed by Plaintiff Heidi-Bianca Crane. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crane v. Utah Housing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi-Bianca Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Colony Mortgage
Represented By: Rodney W. Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Housing Corporation
Represented By: Stephen F. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Title Insurance Agency
Represented By: Stephen F. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?