Tyrrel v. Maskcara Industries
Plaintiff: Kirsten Tyrrel
Defendant: Maskcara Industries
Case Number: 4:2019cv00089
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #8 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY AND COMPEL ARBITRATION UNDER THE FEDERAL ARBITRATION ACT filed by Defendant Maskcara Industries. (Luman, Victoria)
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY AND COMPEL ARBITRATION UNDER THE FEDERAL ARBITRATION ACT filed by Defendant Maskcara Industries. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of DJ Poyfair, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Nick Killpack)(Luman, Victoria)
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to prepare Schedule and prepare for Case Management Conference and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Kirsten Tyrrel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Wilde, Jessica)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Jessica P. Wilde filed by Kirsten Tyrrel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD)(Wilde, Jessica)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY AND COMPEL ARBITRATION UNDER THE FEDERAL ARBITRATION ACT filed by Plaintiff Kirsten Tyrrel. (Wilde, Jessica)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan O. Hafen on behalf of Maskcara Industries (Hafen, Jonathan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria R. Luman on behalf of Maskcara Industries (Luman, Victoria)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY AND COMPEL ARBITRATION UNDER THE FEDERAL ARBITRATION ACT filed by Defendant Maskcara Industries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policies and Procedures) Attorney Michael S. Anderson added to party Maskcara Industries(pty:dft)(Anderson, Michael)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/5/2019. (asb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kirsten Tyrrel as to Maskcara Industries served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Signed Summons)(Wilde, Jessica)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Maskcara Industries. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 10/31/19 (alt)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (asb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Maskcara Industries (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3406531) filed by Kirsten Tyrrel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Suspension Letter, #3 Exhibit B - 2019.06.05 Letter, #4 Exhibit C - 2019.06.19 Letter, #5 Exhibit D - October Email) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Wilde, Jessica)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff Kirsten Tyrrel is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyrrel v. Maskcara Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maskcara Industries
Represented By: Jonathan O. Hafen
Represented By: Victoria R. Luman
Represented By: Michael S. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirsten Tyrrel
Represented By: P. Matthew Muir
Represented By: Jessica P. Wilde
Represented By: J. Angus Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?