Western Watersheds Project v. United States Forest Service
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Case Number: 4:2019cv00097
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER re #9 Order to Propose Schedule. The requirements of the #9 Order are vacated. Scheduling in this case is governed by DUCivR 7-4. The parties are directed to proceed with scheduling the case under DUCivR 7-4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on December 2, 2019. No attached document. (jaw)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 11/21/19 (alt)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/21/2019. (asb)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (asb)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to US Attorney's Office. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to the Attorney General. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Forest Service. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Laura Welp re #2 Complaint,, filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Manning Creek Observations Map, #2 Exhibit Kingston Observations Map, #3 Exhibit Forshea Observations Map)(Persell, John)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against United States Forest Service (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3425150) filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PDF of Hyperlink 1, #2 Exhibit PDF of Hyperlink 2, #3 Exhibit PDF of Hyperlink 3, #4 Exhibit PDF of Hyperlink 4, #5 Exhibit PDF of Hyperlink 5, #6 Exhibit PDF of Hyperlink 6, #7 Exhibit PDF of Hyperlink 7, #8 Exhibit PDF of Hyperlink 8, #9 Exhibit PDF of Hyperlink 9, #10 Exhibit PDF of Hyperlink 10, #11 Exhibit PDF of Hyperlink 11, #12 Exhibit PDF of Hyperlink 12, #13 Exhibit PDF of Hyperlink 13, #14 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Persell, John) Modified on 11/21/2019 to add correct receipt number (nl).
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Watersheds Project v. United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: John Sterling Persell
Represented By: John S. Persell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?