Tolton et al v. Haddon et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Tolton and Davey Jo Williams
Defendant: Victor Kersey, Shane Nelson, Mike Haddon and Devin Blood
Case Number: 4:2020cv00003
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christopher Tolton as to Shane Nelson Waiver sent on 2/10/2020, answer due 4/10/2020. (Hawkins, Tyler)
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christopher Tolton as to Mike Haddon Waiver sent on 2/10/2020, answer due 4/10/2020. (Hawkins, Tyler)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christopher Tolton as to Devin Blood Waiver sent on 2/10/2020, answer due 4/10/2020. (Hawkins, Tyler)
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Victor Kersey. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Shane Nelson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Mike Haddon. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Devin Blood. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 1/24/2020. (asb)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (asb)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 26N1M94J) filed by Christopher Tolton, Davey Jo Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Initiating Document) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Hawkins, Tyler)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiffs Christopher Tolton and Davey Jo Williams are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tolton et al v. Haddon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Tolton
Represented By: Tyler M. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davey Jo Williams
Represented By: Tyler M. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Kersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Haddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Blood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?