Quadri v. Stanly et al
Plaintiff: Kayode Quadri
Defendant: Adon Pearson, James Stanly, Jake Schultz and John Worlton
Not Classified By Court: Correction Section (FYI) and Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 4:2020cv00007
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for a copy of the local Federal Rules filed by Plaintiff Kayode Quadri. (kpf)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to waive Initial Partial Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff Kayode Quadri. (kpf)
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT TO COLLECTION OF FEES from Inmate Trust Account filed by Kayode Quadri. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Adon Pearson, Jake Schultz, James Stanly, John Worlton (Originally received by the court on 02/06/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Kayode Quadri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (tlh)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: $13.47. If initial partial fee is not paid within 30 days, the case will be dismissed. Collection of Fees Sent: Yes; denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 02/18/2020. (tlh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Kayode Quadri. (tlh)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia Romero for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 02/60/2020) filed by Plaintiff Kayode Quadri. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quadri v. Stanly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adon Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stanly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Worlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayode Quadri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?