Wright v. Carr et al
Plaintiff: Jon Q. Wright
Defendant: Fredrick Allen Carr, 212 Fahrenheit Clothing and Sportsmans Warehouse
Case Number: 4:2020cv00030
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/16/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 6/25/2020. Expert Discovery due by 5/7/2021. Motions due by 6/4/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2021 at 08:30 AM in Room 2B (St George) before Judge David Nuffer. 2-Day Jury Trial set for 11/16/2021 at 08:15 AM in Room 2B (St George) before Judge David Nuffer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 5/28/20 (alt)
May 28, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF HEARING: Case Management Conference set for Friday, 6/5/2020 at 01:30 PM by Zoom Video Conference before Judge David Nuffer. Video Conference information has been emailed to counsel and court reporter by Outlook calendar invitation. For other individuals (media, public, etc) wishing to listen to the hearing, they are instructed to email Judge Nuffer's chambers at dj.nuffer@utd.uscourts.gov to obtain call in information. (asb)
May 21, 2020 Filing 20 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Roberts, Charles)
May 5, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING:Telephonic Case Management & Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 6/5/2020 at 01:30 PMJudge David Nuffer. . The Attorney Planning Meeting Report must be filed and the Proposed Scheduling Order must be emailed in word processing format to dj.nuffer@utd.uscourts.gov at least one week before the Conference.Telephone Conference information has been emailed to counsel court reporter. For other individuals (media, public, family, etc) wishing to listen to the hearing, they are instructed to email Judge Nuffer's chambers at dj.nuffer@utd.uscourts.gov to obtain call in information. (asb)
May 1, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against 212 Fahrenheit Clothing, Fredrick Allen Carr filed by Sportsmans Warehouse. Attorney Jason D. Boren added to party Sportsmans Warehouse(pty:dft)(Boren, Jason)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: the deadline for Defendant's answer to the Complaint is extended by 60 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 4/29/20 (alt)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #15 Pro Se Motion for Email Filing and Notification. So ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 4/29/20 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
April 29, 2020 Filing 15 Pro Se MOTION for Email Filing and Notification filed by Defendant Fredrick Allen Carr (Attachments: #1 Pro Se ECF Reg Form) Motion referred to Paul Kohler (alt)
April 29, 2020 Filing 14 Corrected Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendant Fredrick Allen Carr. Motion referred to Paul Kohler (alt)
April 28, 2020 Filing 13 Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendant Fredrick Allen Carr. Motion referred to Paul Kohler (alt)
April 8, 2020 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jon Q. Wright as to Sportsmans Warehouse served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons)(Roberts, Charles)
April 8, 2020 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jon Q. Wright as to 212 Fahrenheit Clothing served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons)(Roberts, Charles)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jon Q. Wright as to Fredrick Allen Carr served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons to Carr)(Roberts, Charles)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/3/2020. (asb)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 4/3/20 (alt)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (asb)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to 212 Fahrenheit Clothing. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Fredrick Allen Carr. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Sportsmans Warehouse. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (kn)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3537199) filed by Jon Q. Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposit copy, #3 Exhibit 3 - Infringing t-shirts, #4 Exhibit 4 - SWI displays, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Roberts, Charles)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff Jon Q. Wright is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Carr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredrick Allen Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 212 Fahrenheit Clothing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sportsmans Warehouse
Represented By: Jason D. Boren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Q. Wright
Represented By: Charles L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?