Hamilton v. Nelson
Petitioner: Tony Alexander Hamilton
Respondent: Shane Nelson
Not Classified By Court: Correction Section (FYI) and Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 4:2020cv00053
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Petitioner Tony Alexander Hamilton (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (alt)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Petitioner Tony Alexander Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State, under 28 U.S.C. 2241 Fee Status: IFP. (Originally received on 06/04/2020) filed by Tony Alexander Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Memorandum in Support of Petition, #4 Affidavit 1, #5 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (jl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2020: #6 rescanned for ocr) (jl).
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: Waived. Collection of Fees Sent: No. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 06/17/2020. (jl)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Tony Alexander Hamilton received from Correctional Institution (kn)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. and Memorandum in Support Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 06/04/2020) filed by Petitioner Tony Alexander Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Affidavit)(kn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tony Alexander Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shane Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?