Hawkins v. Third District Court et al
Petitioner: Dallin Hawkins
Respondent: Thomas V. Lopresto, II, A. Shane Nelson, Central Utah Correctional Facility, Utah State Board of Pardons, Tessa Hansen, Third District Court, Linda Jones, Brett Keeler and Utah Department of Corrections
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 4:2020cv00090
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of correspondence and items styled as "exhibits" from Petitioner. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 "Exhibit 10", #2 "Exhibit 11", #3 "Exhibit 12", #4 Envelope)(alt)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to waive copy fees; (to provide plaintiff copies) filed by Petitioner Dallin Hawkins. (kpf)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 Memorandum of falsified statements made in the PSI Report filed by Dallin Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope )(kpf)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Joinder filed by Petitioner Dallin Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Context, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Envelope, #10 Cover Letter)(kpf)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 EXHIBITS filed by Dallin Hawkins re #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Envelope)(kpf)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 EXHIBIT I filed by Dallin Hawkins re #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: All defendants filed by Petitioner Dallin Hawkins. (jl)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Petitioner Dallin Hawkins. (jl)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4681091707) Fee Status: paid. (Originally received on 08/31/2020) filed by Dallin Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #3 Envelope 1, #4 Envelope 2) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (jl)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 09/14/2020. (jl)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Dallin Hawkins received from Correctional Institution (dw)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 08/19/2020) filed by Petitioner Dallin Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Third District Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas V. Lopresto, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A. Shane Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Central Utah Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Utah State Board of Pardons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tessa Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Third District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Linda Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brett Keeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Utah Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dallin Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?