Hall v. USA
Petitioner: Virgil Hall
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 4:2020cv00098
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S JUDGMENT that the motion is denied and the case is dismissed - CASE CLOSED. Signed by ALT, Deputy Clerk (alt)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying and dismissing for lack of jurisdiction Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 9/14/20 (alt)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 Case transferred in from USDC of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00180. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Assigned to Judge David Nuffer.
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 11. Mon Aug 24 10:46:30 CDT 2020 (Kratzer, Katie) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER the instant motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence to the United States District Court for the District of Utah, Central Division. See 28 U.S.C. 1631. [A COPY OF DIRECTED MOTION MAILED TO THE DISTRICT OF UTAH THIS DATE] Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 8/24/2020. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Petitioner Virgil Hall. (NEP) (Address updated in cm/ecf on 8/13/2020.) (CBL). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by Petitioner Virgil Hall. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8. Tue Jul 14 11:55:32 CDT 2020 (Phillips, Nicole) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioners motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #4 ) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this Order in which to advise the Court in writing whether he wishes to withdraw the instant petition or to consent to its reclassification as a motion brought pursuant 28 U.S.C. 2255. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Petitioner consents to the Court's reclassification of the petition as a motion brought pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, he must also file an amended motion to vacate on the court-provided form within thirty (30) days of the date of this order.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to Petitioner a copy of the Court's 28 U.S.C. 2255 form. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Petitioner's failure to respond to this order within thirty (30) days will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 7/13/20. (Note: 2255 form mailed to petitioner this date.) (ARL) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 Letter to Clerk of Court from Virgil Hall re: Docket Sheet Request (Address has been updated in ECF/ Docket sheet mailed this date.) (ARL) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Petitioner Virgil Hall. (ARL) Address updated in CM/ECF on 3/3/2020 (CMC). [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Virgil Hall. Returned document(s): #3 Clerk's Reassignment Order,. New address given to CMC and clerk resent document. (sent order to address listed on doc #4 ). (AAT) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Tue Feb 4 09:07:58 CST 2020 (O'Leary, Deborah) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 3 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). The above styled and numbered case was opened on January 30, 2020 and randomly assigned to the Honorable Nannette A. Baker, United States Magistrate Judge. However, it was determined the case should have been randomly assigned to a United States District Judge. Accordingly, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the above-styled cause is reassigned to the Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk, United States District Judge. (DJO) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Virgil Hall. (NEP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
January 31, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Jan 31 15:00:56 CST 2020 (admin,) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (DJO) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
January 31, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DJO) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/10/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2241 by Petitioner Virgil Hall. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Judge Assignment Label, #3 Envelope)(DJO) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 9/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Virgil Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?