Scaccia v. USA
Petitioner: Bill Frank Scaccia
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 4:2020cv00103
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), filed by USA. (Dent, Stephen)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 Mail sent to Bill Frank Scaccia re docket entry #2 Returned as Undeliverable. Dft has been moved by BOP to FCI Safford, AZ. Mail will be resent to dft at that institution. (alt) Modified on 10/15/2020 correcting entry date(jwt).
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO RESPOND - USA must respond to #1 Petitioner's 28 U.S.C. 2255 Motion to Vacate within 60 days of this order. Any reply must be filed by Mr. Scaccia within 30 days after the filing of the governments response. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 9/22/20 (alt)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). Related case: 4:19-cr-115. No filing fee required. AUSA added to the case: Yes. filed by Bill Frank Scaccia. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scaccia v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Dent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bill Frank Scaccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?