Bailey v. Sixth District Court, Sanpete County et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Don Bailey
Defendant: A. Shane Nelson, Kevin Daniels, Utah Department of Corrections, Central Utah Correctional Facility, Utah State Board of Pardons, Sixth District Court, Sanpete County and FNU Lee
Not Classified By Court: Correction Section (FYI) and Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 4:2021cv00023
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 **SEALED DOCUMENT**Inmate Statement filed by Plaintiff Ryan Don Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(kpf)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Central Utah Correctional Facility, Kevin Daniels, FNU Lee, A. Shane Nelson, Sixth District Court, Sanpete County, Utah Department of Corrections, Utah State Board of Pardons (Originally received by the court on 02/22/2021). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Ryan Don Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (mh)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No; denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 04/05/2021. (mh)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Originally filed with the court on 02/22/2021) filed by Plaintiff Ryan Don Bailey. (mh)
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 02/22/2021) filed by Plaintiff Ryan Don Bailey. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Sixth District Court, Sanpete County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Don Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Shane Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Utah Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah State Board of Pardons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sixth District Court, Sanpete County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?