Blackmore et al v. Carlson et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Blackmore and Danyale Blackmore
Defendant: FNU Ramirez, Hurricane, City of, Washington County, Jared Carlson and Eric Demille
Case Number: 4:2021cv00026
Filed: March 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vincent Blackmore, Danyale Blackmore as to Jared Carlson served on 4/27/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. (Sykes, Robert)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vincent Blackmore, Danyale Blackmore as to Eric Demille served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Sykes, Robert)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vincent Blackmore, Danyale Blackmore as to Hurricane, City of served on 4/7/2021, answer due 4/28/2021. (Sykes, Robert)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Continue/Postpone Attorney Planning Meeting Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 4/8/21 (alt)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION to Continue deadline re #5 Order to Propose Schedule, and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Danyale Blackmore, Vincent Blackmore. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stip M-Postpone APMR) Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Sorensen, Christopher) Modified on 4/8/2021: corrected motion relief (alt)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Hurricane, City of. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Eric Demille. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jared Carlson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Vincent Blackmore, Danyale Blackmore as to Washington County Waiver sent on 3/24/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Sykes, Robert)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 3/4/21 (alt)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/4/2021. (pjd)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (pjd)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3941002) filed by Vincent Blackmore, Danyale Blackmore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet to Complaint) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Sykes, Robert)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiffs Danyale Blackmore, Vincent Blackmore is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackmore et al v. Carlson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hurricane, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Demille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Blackmore
Represented By: Christopher Peter Sorensen
Represented By: Robert B. Sykes
Represented By: Christina Dawn Isom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danyale Blackmore
Represented By: Christopher Peter Sorensen
Represented By: Robert B. Sykes
Represented By: Christina Dawn Isom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?