Maxfield et al v. Cox et al
Plaintiff: Steven G. Maxfield, Marnee Anderson, Daniel Newby and Lori Newby
Defendant: Spencer Cox, Justin Lee and Deidre Henderson
Case Number: 4:2021cv00031
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 18 JUDGMENT the Plaintiffs' Complaint and this action are dismissed with prejudice - CASE CLOSED. Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/26/21 (alt)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER dismissing as moot #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting #16 Stipulated Motion for Injunctive Relief; granting #16 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/26/21 (alt)
April 21, 2021 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Spencer Cox, Deidre Henderson, Justin Lee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorenson, Lance)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #13 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file their reply memorandum on the #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is extended to April 22, 2021. Defendants' responsive pleading shall be due 14 days after the Court enters an order on the #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on April 13, 2021. No attached document. (bde)
April 12, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Spencer Cox, Deidre Henderson, Justin Lee. (Sorenson, Lance)
April 12, 2021 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Filing Deadlines filed by Defendants Spencer Cox, Deidre Henderson, Justin Lee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul Kohler. Attorney Lance F. Sorenson added to party Spencer Cox(pty:dft), Attorney Lance F. Sorenson added to party Deidre Henderson(pty:dft), Attorney Lance F. Sorenson added to party Justin Lee(pty:dft)(Sorenson, Lance)
April 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support : Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2021 at 01:00 PM by Zoom video conference before Judge David Nuffer. Conference link will be emailed to counsel and court reporter by Outlook calendar invitation. Counsel may share the link with clients wishing to participate. All others (media, public, etc) may email dj.nuffer@utd.uscourts.gov to obtain conference information. (pjd)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Expedited Hearing Regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants shall file their response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before April 12, 2021. Plaintiffs shall file their reply on or before April 19, 2021. A hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction will be set for April 29, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on March 31, 2021. No attached document. (bde)
March 29, 2021 Filing 10 Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Marnee Anderson, Steven G. Maxfield, Daniel Newby, Lori Newby. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Expedited Hearing) Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Teter, Michael)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/23/21. (pjd)
March 22, 2021 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Justin Lee. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Lieutenant Governor Deidre Henderson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Governor Spencer Cox. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 3/19/21 (alt)
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (pjd) Modified on 3/19/2021 to add notice text.
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Marnee Anderson, Steven G. Maxfield, Daniel Newby, Lori Newby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Steve Maxfield, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Marnee Anderson, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Daniel Newby, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Lori Newby)(Teter, Michael)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3956092) filed by Steven G. Maxfield, Marnee Anderson, Lori Newby, Daniel Newby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Teter, Michael)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiffs Marnee Anderson, Steven G. Maxfield, Daniel Newby, Lori Newby is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxfield et al v. Cox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Cox
Represented By: Lance F. Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Lee
Represented By: Lance F. Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deidre Henderson
Represented By: Lance F. Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven G. Maxfield
Represented By: Michael J. Teter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marnee Anderson
Represented By: Michael J. Teter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Newby
Represented By: Michael J. Teter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Newby
Represented By: Michael J. Teter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?