Maxfield et al v. Cox et al
Plaintiff: Steven G. Maxfield, Lori Newby and Daniel Newby
Defendant: Spencer Cox and Deidre Henderson
Case Number: 4:2021cv00051
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Nuffer: Case Management and Scheduling Conference held on 6/29/2021. Counsel, court, and court reporter present by Zoom video conference. Discussion heard on the allegations stated in the complaint and current scheduling order. Court adjourned. Attorney for Plaintiff: Joel Ban, Attorney for Defendant: David Wolf. Court Reporter: Kelly Sommerville.(Time Start: 11:01, Time End: 11:23, Room 2B St. George.)(pjd)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Notice of filing of Deposition Plan by Steven G. Maxfield, Daniel Newby, Lori Newby (Ban, Joel)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF FILING of Deposition Plan filed by Defendants Spencer Cox, Deidre Henderson. (Sorenson, Lance)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven G. Maxfield, Daniel Newby, Lori Newby Initial Disclosures (Ban, Joel)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/6/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 8/6/2021. Expert Discovery due by 8/24/2021. Motions due by 8/31/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2021 at 02:00 PM in Room 2B (St George) before Judge David Nuffer. 2-Day Bench Trial set for 12/13/2021 at 08:15 AM in Room 2B (St George) before Judge David Nuffer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 6/3/21 (alt)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorenson, Lance)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING: Case Management & Scheduling Conference set for 6/29/2021 at 11:00 AM by zoom video conference before Judge David Nuffer. The Attorney Planning Meeting Report must be filed and the Proposed Scheduling Order must be emailed in word processing format to dj.nuffer@utd.uscourts.gov at least one week before the Conference.Conference link emailed to counsel and court reporter by Outlook calendar invitation. Counsel may share the link with clients wishing to participate. All others (media, public, etc) may email dj.nuffer@utd.uscourts.gov to obtain conference information. (pjd)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Spencer Cox, Deidre Henderson.(Sorenson, Lance)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/19/2021. (pjd)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 5/13/21 (alt)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David N. Wolf on behalf of Spencer Cox, Deidre Henderson (Wolf, David)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance F. Sorenson on behalf of Spencer Cox, Deidre Henderson (Sorenson, Lance)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (pjd)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to the Utah Attorney General's Office. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4001221) filed by Steven G. Maxfield, Daniel Newby, Lori Newby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Ban, Joel) Modified on 5/10/2021 to correct who the complaint is filed against (mh).
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiffs Steven G. Maxfield, Daniel Newby, Lori Newby are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Modification of Docket: Error: Plaintiff filed against themselves. Correction: Docket text has been modified to reflect complaint is filed against defendants rather than plaintiff; answer records corrected, re #2 Complaint. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxfield et al v. Cox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Cox
Represented By: David N. Wolf
Represented By: Lance F. Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deidre Henderson
Represented By: David N. Wolf
Represented By: Lance F. Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven G. Maxfield
Represented By: Joel M. Ban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Newby
Represented By: Joel M. Ban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Newby
Represented By: Joel M. Ban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?