Seegmiller v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Chace Seegmiller
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul and Kilolo Kijakazi
Not Classified By Court: SSA Notice
Case Number: 4:2021cv00069
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi per General Order 21-005, Plaintiff Chace Seegmiller per attached consent form. (alf)
July 14, 2021 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Chace Seegmiller. (alf)
July 14, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: Kilolo Kijakazi became the Acting Commissioner of Social Security on July 9, 2021. Pursuant to Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the last sentence of section 205(g) of the Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. 405(g), Kilolo Kijakazi is substituted for Andrew Saul as the defendant in this suit. (nmt)
July 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 21 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Chace Seegmiller. Form due by 8/2/2021. (alf)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda A. Berndt on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Berndt, Amanda)
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to the Attorney General of the United States. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to the US Attorney's Office Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Andrew M. Saul. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul (Originally received by the court on 06/23/2021). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Chace Seegmiller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler (nmt)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 06/29/2021. (nmt)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and Envelope. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(nmt)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 06/23/2021) filed by Plaintiff Chace Seegmiller. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seegmiller v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA Notice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Amanda A. Berndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Amanda A. Berndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chace Seegmiller
Represented By: Natalie L. Bolli-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?