American Rocky Mountaineer v. Grand County State of Utah
Plaintiff: American Rocky Mountaineer
Defendant: Grand County State of Utah
Case Number: 4:2021cv00072
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Defendant's RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgement filed by Grand County State of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Sloan, Christina)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Stipulation regarding Operation of Plaintiff's Passenger Rail Service by American Rocky Mountaineer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation regarding Operation of Plaintiff's Passenger Rail Service) (Sorenson, Amy)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING: Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2021 at 11:00 AM in Judges Chambers before Judge David Nuffer. The Attorney Planning Meeting Report must be filed and the Proposed Scheduling Order must be emailed in word processing format to dj.nuffer@utd.uscourts.gov at least one week before the Conference.Conference link emailed to counsel and court reporter by Outlook calendar invitation. Counsel may share the link with clients wishing to participate. All others (media, public, etc) may email dj.nuffer@utd.uscourts.gov to obtain conference information. (pjd)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Grand County ANSWER to Complaint filed by Grand County State of Utah. Attorney Christina R. Sloan added to party Grand County State of Utah (pty:dft)(Sloan, Christina)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Evidence to Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 1 to Appendix of Evidence to Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer's Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit 2 to Appendix of Evidence to Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit 3 to Appendix of Evidence to Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer's Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit 4 to Appendix of Evidence to Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer's Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Exhibit 5 to Appendix of Evidence to Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer's Motion for Summary Judgment, #7 Exhibit 6 to Appendix of Evidence to Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer's Motion for Summary Judgment, #8 Exhibit 7 to Appendix of Evidence to Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer's Motion for Summary Judgment, #9 Exhibit 8 to Appendix of Evidence to Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer's Motion for Summary Judgment, #10 Exhibit 9 to Appendix of Evidence to Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer's Motion for Summary Judgment, #11 Exhibit 10 to Appendix of Evidence to Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer's Motion for Summary Judgment, #12 Exhibit 11 to Appendix of Evidence to Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer's Motion for Summary Judgment, #13 Exhibit 12 to Appendix of Evidence to Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer's Motion for Summary Judgment, #14 Exhibit 13 to Appendix of Evidence to Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer's Motion for Summary Judgment, #15 Exhibit 14 to Appendix of Evidence to Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer's Motion for Summary Judgment, #16 Exhibit 15 to Appendix of Evidence to Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer's Motion for Summary Judgment, #17 Affidavit Declaration of Amy F. Sorenson in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Sorenson, Amy)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kevin Michael Sheys for American Rocky Mountaineer.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. So ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 7/8/21 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathryn L. Lannon for American Rocky Mountaineer.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. So ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 7/8/21 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin Sheys , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4051510,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kevin Sheys, #2 Text of Proposed Order B - Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kevin Sheys)(Sorenson, Amy)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kathryn L. Lannon , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4051473,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kevin Sheys)(Sorenson, Amy)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 7/6/2021. (pjd)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 7/2/21 (alt)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Rocky Mountaineer as to Grand County State of Utah served on 7/1/2021, answer due 7/22/2021. (Cutler, Cameron)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (pjd)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv, for Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer (nmt)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Grand County State of Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Grand County State of Utah (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4047809) filed by American Rocky Mountaineer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Sorenson, Amy)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff American Rocky Mountaineer is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Rocky Mountaineer v. Grand County State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Rocky Mountaineer
Represented By: Cameron J. Cutler
Represented By: Amy F. Sorenson
Represented By: Kathryn L. Lannon
Represented By: Kevin Michael Sheys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand County State of Utah
Represented By: Christina R. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?