Hale v. Washington County Sheriff's Department
Plaintiff: Jason Hale
Defendant: Washington County Sheriff's Department
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 4:2021cv00074
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED MOTION for Injunction filed by Plaintiff Jason Hale. (kpf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2021: #1 Re-Scanned for OCR) (am).
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Joinder (to add parties) filed by Plaintiff Jason Hale. (kpf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2021: #1 Envelope) (kpf).
July 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to fully waive the Initial Partial Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff Jason Hale. (kpf)
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Jason Hale. (kpf)
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT TO COLLECTION OF FEES from Inmate Trust Account filed by Jason Hale. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Washington County Sheriff's Department (Originally received by the court on 07/09/2021). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Jason Hale. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (mh)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). ; granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: $27.57. If initial partial fee is not paid within 30 days, the case will be dismissed. Collection of Fees Sent: Yes Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 07/12/2021. (mh)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: all defendants (originally received by the court on 07/09/2021) filed by Plaintiff Jason Hale. (mh)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, Motion for Marshal Services, Cover Sheet and Envelope. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Motion for Marshal Services, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(mh)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Jason Hale received from Correctional Institution. (mh)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 07/09/2021) filed by Plaintiff Jason Hale. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hale v. Washington County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?