Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance v. Cleaver et al
Plaintiff: Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance
Defendant: Brian Cleaver, Sundaelee Cleaver, Jill Cleaver and Eric N. Cleaver
Case Number: 4:2021cv00082
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance as to Eric N. Cleaver served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Minnock, Joseph)
August 20, 2021 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance as to Sundaelee Cleaver served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Minnock, Joseph)
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance as to Brian Cleaver served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Minnock, Joseph)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Sundaelee Cleaver. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jill Cleaver. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Eric N. Cleaver. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Brian Cleaver. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/10/2021. (pjd)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 8/10/21 (alt)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (pjd)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4076831) filed by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Policy of Insurance) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Minnock, Joseph)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance v. Cleaver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance
Represented By: Joseph E. Minnock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Cleaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundaelee Cleaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Cleaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric N. Cleaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?