Daniels v. Garrett et al
Plaintiff: Danny L. Daniels
Defendant: Scott F. Garrett, Maria E.A. Sanchez and Ashley Dietz
Not Classified By Court: Correction Section (FYI) and Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 4:2021cv00085
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 **SEALED DOCUMENT** Resident Transcations filed by Plaintiff Danny L. Daniels. (kpf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/2/2021: #1 Re-Scanned for Missing Pages) (am).
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 **SEALED DOCUMENT** 2nd MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Danny L. Daniels. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Plaintiff shall within thirty days to file with the court the completed required affidavit and a certified copy of Plaintiffs inmate trust fund account statement(s). If Plaintiff does not fully comply, his complaint will be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 08/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs)(mh)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Violation Report. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (mh)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, Motion for Appointment of Counsel, Notice to Submit, Proposed Summons, Envelope. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #2 Notice to Submit, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Envelope)(mh)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 08/06/2021) filed by Plaintiff Danny L. Daniels. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Garrett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny L. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott F. Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria E.A. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Dietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?