USA v. 174922 Seized from JP Morgan Chase Account 1101 et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: 174922 Seized from JP Morgan Chase Account 1101, 20522 Seized from JP Morgan Chase Account 3137, 135009 Seized from JP Morgan Chase Account 9388, 75016 Seized from JP Morgan Chase Account 8295, 5694 Seized from JP Morgan Chase Account 7770, 6177 Seized from JP Morgan Chase Account 1738, 300016 Seized from JP Morgan Chase Account 3878, 372915 Seized from Cache Valley Bank Account 1824 and 9529, 5315 Seized from Mountain View Title in the Name of Fang Properties, 47934 Seized from the Ma Residence Located at 492 E CARRIAGE LN WASHINGTON UT 847801, 60825 from the Proceeds of the Sale of a 2019 Ford F-150 Raport Vin#1 FTFWl RG8KFB46127, 492 E CARRIAGE LN WASHINGTON UT 84780, Desert Bluff Townhome 63 at 5929 S FIREBIRD WY ST GEORGE UT 84970, Blackhawk Townhome 55 at 1001 CURLY HOLLOW DR ST GEORGE UT 84790, Fossil Hills Townhome 62 at 3151 RELIC RDG DR ST GEORGE UT 84790, Fossil Hills Townhome 60 at 3161 S RELIC RDG DR ST GEORGE UT 84790 and Desert Bluffs Townhome 57 at 5961 S FIREBIRD WY ST GEORGE UT 84790
Case Number: 4:2021cv00120
Filed: December 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 ff
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Filing 20 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Warrant for Arrest in Rem served on $63,000 (currently $60,195 due to various fees) from proceeds of the sale of a 2019 Ford F-150 Raptor VIN: 1FTFW1RG8KFB46127 on 01/14/2022, filed by Plaintiff USA. (Castle, Cy)
January 27, 2022 Filing 19 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on $47,934 in United States currency on 01/11/2022, filed by Plaintiff USA. (Castle, Cy)
January 27, 2022 Filing 18 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on $5,315 seized from Mountain View Title in the name of Fang Properties, LLC on 01/11/2022, filed by Plaintiff USA. (Castle, Cy)
January 27, 2022 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on $372,914.45 in U.S. currency seized from Cache Valley Bank Accounts Ending in 1824 and 9529, filed by Plaintiff USA. (Castle, Cy)
January 27, 2022 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on $300,015.89 in U.S. currency seized from JPM Chase acct ending in 3878 on 01/11/2022, filed by Plaintiff USA. (Castle, Cy)
January 27, 2022 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on $6,177.02 in U.S. currency seized from JPM Chase acct ending in 1738 on 01/11/2022, filed by Plaintiff USA. (Castle, Cy)
January 27, 2022 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on $5,694.98 in U.S. Currency Seized from JPM Chase Ckg Acct Ending in 8295 on 01/11/2022, filed by Plaintiff USA. (Castle, Cy)
January 27, 2022 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on $75,015.24 in U.S. currency seized from JPM Chase acct ending in 7770 on 01/11/2022, filed by Plaintiff USA. (Castle, Cy)
January 27, 2022 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on $135,008.99 in U.S. currency seized from JPM Chase acct ending in 9388 on 01/11/2022, filed by Plaintiff USA. (Castle, Cy)
January 27, 2022 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on $20,522.01 in U.S. currency seized from JPM Chase acct ending in 3137 on 01/11/2022, filed by Plaintiff USA. (Castle, Cy)
January 27, 2022 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on $174,922 in U.S. currency seized from JPM Chase acct ending in 1101 on 01/10/2022, filed by Plaintiff USA. (Castle, Cy)
January 25, 2022 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Post & Walk served on Defendant Real Properties on 12/16/2021 & 12/17/2021, filed by Plaintiff USA. (Castle, Cy)
January 18, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Compliance of Publication by USA (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Advertisement Certification Report) (Castle, Cy)
January 11, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of SERVICE by USA re #5 Warrant Issued, #2 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Castle, Cy)
December 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens filed by Plaintiff USA (Attachments: #1 Lis Pendens PN: SG-BHSG-3-55, #2 Lis Pendens PN: SG-FOSS-7AND8-62, #3 Lis Pendens PN: SG-FOSS-7AND8-60, #4 Lis Pendens PN: SG-DDCT-1-63, #5 Lis Pendens PN: SG-DDCT-1-57) (Castle, Cy)
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 Warrant of Arrest In Rem WARRANT ISSUED as to $174,922 Seized from JPMorgan Chase Account Ending 1101, et al on 12/10/21, by Anne Morgan, Chief Deputy Clerk. (jwt)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 12/7/2021. (pjd)
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (pjd)
December 3, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against All Defendants No Filing Fee filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Castle, Cy)
December 3, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff USA is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (USA)NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 174922 Seized from JP Morgan Chase Account 1101 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Tyler L. Murray
Represented By: Cy H. Castle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 174922 Seized from JP Morgan Chase Account 1101
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 20522 Seized from JP Morgan Chase Account 3137
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 135009 Seized from JP Morgan Chase Account 9388
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 75016 Seized from JP Morgan Chase Account 8295
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5694 Seized from JP Morgan Chase Account 7770
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6177 Seized from JP Morgan Chase Account 1738
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 300016 Seized from JP Morgan Chase Account 3878
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 372915 Seized from Cache Valley Bank Account 1824 and 9529
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5315 Seized from Mountain View Title in the Name of Fang Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 47934 Seized from the Ma Residence Located at 492 E CARRIAGE LN WASHINGTON UT 847801
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 60825 from the Proceeds of the Sale of a 2019 Ford F-150 Raport Vin#1 FTFWl RG8KFB46127
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 492 E CARRIAGE LN WASHINGTON UT 84780
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Bluff Townhome 63 at 5929 S FIREBIRD WY ST GEORGE UT 84970
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackhawk Townhome 55 at 1001 CURLY HOLLOW DR ST GEORGE UT 84790
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fossil Hills Townhome 62 at 3151 RELIC RDG DR ST GEORGE UT 84790
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fossil Hills Townhome 60 at 3161 S RELIC RDG DR ST GEORGE UT 84790
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Bluffs Townhome 57 at 5961 S FIREBIRD WY ST GEORGE UT 84790
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?