Commerce Commercial Partners v. Milliken & Company
Plaintiff: Commerce Commercial Partners
Defendant: Milliken & Company
Case Number: 4:2022cv00020
Filed: March 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Milliken & Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2006 0531 letter, #2 Exhibit B - 2006 0612 letter, #3 Exhibit C - 2007 0928 letter, #4 Exhibit D - 2020 0713 & 0714 emails, #5 Exhibit E - 2020 0813 Email Response, #6 Exhibit F - Response to 2021 0318 letter, #7 Exhibit G - Response to 2021 0408 letter)(Larsen, Kristine)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Gregory Hardman on behalf of Commerce Commercial Partners (Hardman, J.)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Troy A. Tessier for Milliken & Company.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. So ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 4/27/22 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Troy A. Tessier , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4317430,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Milliken & Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Larsen, Kristine)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint: Answer deadline updated for Milliken & Company - answer due 5/12/2022; granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to 5/26/22 for parties to file an Attorney Planning Meeting Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 4/13/22 (alt)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint,, , Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Proposed Attorney Planning Meeting Report filed by Defendant Milliken & Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Proposed Attorney Planning Meeting Report) Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Larsen, Kristine)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob G Roberts on behalf of Milliken & Company (Roberts, Jacob)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristine M. Larsen on behalf of Milliken & Company (Larsen, Kristine)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commerce Commercial Partners as to Milliken & Company served on 3/31/2022, answer due 4/21/2022. (Hardman, J.)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/1/2022. (pjd)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/30/22 (alt)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (pjd)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Milliken & Company. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Commerce Commercial Partners. (Hardman, J.)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Milliken & Company (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4290389) filed by Commerce Commercial Partners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Lease Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Jan. 12, 2020 Letter, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Email Correspondence, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - May 29, 2020 Letter, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - July 10, 2020 Letter, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - July 14, 2020 Letter, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - Mar. 18, 2021 Letter, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 - Apr. 8, 2021 Letter, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Hardman, J.)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff Commerce Commercial Partners is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commerce Commercial Partners v. Milliken & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commerce Commercial Partners
Represented By: J. Gregory Hardman
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Miles
Represented By: Sean James Romney, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milliken & Company
Represented By: Jacob G Roberts
Represented By: Kristine M. Larsen
Represented By: Troy A. Tessier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?