Hilterbrand et al v. Depuy Synthes Products et al
Plaintiff: Carol Hilterbrand and Charles Hilterbrand
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Products and Depuy Synthes Sales
Case Number: 4:2022cv00024
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
2 Judge: Jill N Parrish
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice on stipulation of parties - CASE CLOSED. Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 12/16/22 (alt)
December 15, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Depuy Synthes Products, Depuy Synthes Sales. (Simpson, W.)
July 13, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carol Hilterbrand, Charles Hilterbrand Plaintiffs First Supplemental Disclosure (Frazier, William)
June 24, 2022 Filing 21 Case Reassigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Judge David Nuffer no longer assigned to the case as a result of Judge Nuffer's interim role as acting Chief Deputy Clerk. Magistrate Judge Referral is unaffected. Case number will now read 4:22-cv-00024-JNP-PK. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (jwt)
June 21, 2022 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler: Case Management Conference held on 6/21/2022. Counsel and court are present by Zoom video conference. Discussion heard on the allegations stated in the complaint and current scheduling order. Court adjourned Attorney for Plaintiff: William E. Frazier, Wil S. Bangerter, Attorney for Defendant: Lauren E.H. DiFrancesco, W. Kennedy Simpson. Court Reporter: Electronic - Zoom.(Time Start: 10:00, Time End: 10:10, Room 2B St. George-Zoom.)(pjd)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/31/2023. Motions due by 9/30/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2024 at 02:30 PM in Room 2B (St George) before Judge David Nuffer. 5 Day Jury Trial set for 3/4/2024 at 08:00 AM in Room 2B (St George) before Judge David Nuffer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 06/14/2022. (jl)
June 13, 2022 Filing 18 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Frazier, William)
May 24, 2022 Filing 17 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING: Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2022 at 10:00 AM by Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler. The Attorney Planning Meeting Report must be filed and the Proposed Scheduling Order must be emailed in word processing format to dj.nuffer@utd.uscourts.gov at least one week before the Conference.Conference link will be emailed to counsel and court reporter by Outlook calendar invitation. Counsel may share the link with clients wishing to participate. All others (media, public, etc) may email dj.nuffer@utd.uscourts.gov to obtain conference information. (pjd)
May 16, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carol Hilterbrand, Charles Hilterbrand Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Frazier, William)
April 26, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING: Case Management & Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2022 at 10:00 AM by Zoom Video Conference before Judge David Nuffer. The Attorney Planning Meeting Report must be filed and the Proposed Scheduling Order must be emailed in word processing format to dj.nuffer@utd.uscourts.gov at least one week before the Conference.Conference link will be emailed to counsel and court reporter by Outlook calendar invitation. Counsel may share the link with clients wishing to participate. All others (media, public, etc) may email dj.nuffer@utd.uscourts.gov to obtain conference information. (pjd)
April 25, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carol Hilterbrand, Charles Hilterbrand Rule 68 Settlement Offer (Frazier, William)
April 25, 2022 Filing 13 Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint filed by Depuy Synthes Products, Depuy Synthes Sales.(DiFrancesco, Lauren)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney W Kennedy Simson for Depuy Synthes Products, Depuy Synthes Sales.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 4/20/22 (alt)
April 20, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of W. Kennedy Simpson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4309725,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Depuy Synthes Products, Depuy Synthes Sales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DiFrancesco, Lauren)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/19/22 (alt)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/19/2022. (pjd)
April 19, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (pjd)
April 18, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendants Depuy Synthes Products, Depuy Synthes Sales identifying Johnson & Johnson as Corporate Parent. (DiFrancesco, Lauren)
April 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #3 MOTION for Disclosure. The document is not a Motion. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading using the correct filing event. The new entry will receive a new document number on the docket. (alt)
April 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney W. Kennedy Simpson, for Defendants Depuy Synthes Products, Depuy Synthes Sales. (mh)
April 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Depuy Synthes Products, Depuy Synthes Sales, Plaintiffs Carol Hilterbrand, Charles Hilterbrand. (mh)
April 18, 2022 Filing 3 ERROR: NOT A MOTION - MOTION for Disclosure of Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Depuy Synthes Products, Depuy Synthes Sales. (DiFrancesco, Lauren) Modified on 4/18/2022: added error text (alt)
April 18, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 5 District Court St George Washington County, case number 220500219, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4309562) filed by Depuy Synthes Sales, Depuy Synthes Products. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Process and Other State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit C-State Court Docket, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (DiFrancesco, Lauren)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Defendants Depuy Synthes Products, Depuy Synthes Sales are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hilterbrand et al v. Depuy Synthes Products et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Hilterbrand
Represented By: William E. Frazier
Represented By: Wil S. Bangerter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hilterbrand
Represented By: William E. Frazier
Represented By: Wil S. Bangerter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Products
Represented By: Lauren E.H. DiFrancesco
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Sales
Represented By: Lauren E.H. DiFrancesco
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?